Balvin v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jared Balvin
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv04153
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company re #6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim (Vogel, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Vogel, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan S. Vogel on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Vogel, Ryan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack H. Hieb on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Hieb, Jack)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed September 9, 2019 Acknowledgement filed by Jared Balvin. (McCahren, Lee)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Family Mutual Insurance Company. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(SLW)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3146291h) filed by Jared Balvin in shell case on 9/4/19. (SLW) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/4/2019) (SLW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balvin v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jack H. Hieb
Represented By: Ryan S. Vogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Balvin
Represented By: Lee C. (Kit) McCahren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?