Newman v. City of Vermillion et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Lee Newman
Defendant: Vermillion Police Department, Matthew Betzen and City of Vermillion
Case Number: 4:2019cv04155
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 22 JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/31/2019. (SLT)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER dismissing as moot #18 Motion to Intervene. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/31/2019. (SLT)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/31/2019. (SLT)
October 30, 2019 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Judgment of Dismissal by Matthew Betzen, City of Vermillion, Vermillion Police Department. (Marso, Lisa)
October 24, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Intervene by Argus Leader Media. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Resistance Motion) (Arneson, Jon)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #16 Motion. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/23/2019. (SLT)
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION TO REMOVE COMPLAINT FROM FILINGS OR TO PERMANENTLY SEAL COMPLAINT & MOTIONS TO SEAL by Matthew Betzen, City of Vermillion, Vermillion Police Department. (Marso, Lisa)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Seal Existing Document. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/4/2019. (SLT)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Seal Existing Document #4 Order on Motion to Seal Document by Matthew Betzen, City of Vermillion, Vermillion Police Department. (Marso, Lisa)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 Settlement Agreement re 12 Settlement Conference. (JLS) (Main Document 13 replaced on 10/4/2019) (JLS).
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 Settlement Conference held on 10/3/2019 before US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy (parties successfully resolved their dispute). (Court Reporter: FTR Ct #3) (CG)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation set for 10/3/2019 at 9:00 AM in Sioux Falls Grand Jury Room - Room 124B* before US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 9/9/2019. (CG)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey E. B. Knoer on behalf of Matthew Betzen, City of Vermillion, Vermillion Police Department. (Knoer, Kelsey)
September 9, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #9 Notice of Appearance was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Marso, Lisa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 9 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Hansen Marso on behalf of Matthew Betzen, City of Vermillion, Vermillion Police Department. (Marso, Lisa) Modified Docket Text on 9/10/2019 (DLC).
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Hansen Marso on behalf of Matthew Betzen, City of Vermillion, Vermillion Police Department. (Marso, Lisa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jessica Lee Newman. Matthew Betzen waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Hughes, John)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jessica Lee Newman. Vermillion Police Department waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Hughes, John)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jessica Lee Newman. City of Vermillion waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Hughes, John)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/6/2019. (CLR)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by Jessica Lee Newman. (CLR)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 3 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (CLR)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX400050741) filed by Jessica Lee Newman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit 2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit 3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit 4 Exhibit) (CLR) Modified on 10/31/2019 to remove sealed restriction per #20 (SLT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman v. City of Vermillion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermillion Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Betzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vermillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lee Newman
Represented By: John R. Hughes
Represented By: Stuart J. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?