Sioux Steel Company v. American International Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sioux Steel Company
Defendant: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania and American International Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04156
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc. for Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Bogard, Heather)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Form 52 Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/1/19. (JLS)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Bogard, Heather)
November 1, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #6 Answer to Complaint was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Bogard, Heather)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Bogard, Heather) Modified on 11/4/2019 (SLT).
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania Unopposed. (Bogard, Heather)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Lammers Bogard on behalf of Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Bogard, Heather)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint ADMISSION OF SERVICE served on Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania on 09/12/2019, filed by Sioux Steel Company. (Goodsell, G.)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American International Group, Inc., Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. 2 Summmonses, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania, #2 Summons - American International Group, Inc, #3 AO85 form)(JLS)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3148459) filed by Sioux Steel Company in shell case on 9/6/19. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sioux Steel Company v. American International Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Heather Lammers Bogard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American International Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sioux Steel Company
Represented By: G. Verne Goodsell
Represented By: Nathan R. Oviatt
Represented By: David S. Barari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?