Whitehurst et al v. The Kingdom Trust Company
Plaintiff: Roy Tromboli, Virginia Darden, Itzhara Saar, Danny Saar, Drake Whitehurst and Dany Saar
Defendant: The Kingdom Trust Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv04158
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/17/2020 Motions due by 8/17/2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 10/28/2019. (CLR)
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 Discovery Report by The Kingdom Trust Company.(Roche, Vincent)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Discovery Report. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/26/2019. (CLR)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The Kingdom Trust Company. (Brost, Ashley)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The Kingdom Trust Company identifying Corporate Parent My Retirement Account Services, LLC for The Kingdom Trust Company. (Brost, Ashley)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Yasmin Cader for Virginia Darden, Dany Saar, Itzhara Saar, Roy Tromboli, and Drake Whitehurst. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/23/2019. (CLR)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christine M. Adams for Virginia Darden,Dany Saar,Itzhara Saar,Roy Tromboli, and Drake Whitehurst. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/23/2019. (CLR)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney Yasmin Cader to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Virginia Darden, Dany Saar, Itzhara Saar, Roy Tromboli, Drake Whitehurst. (Sutton, Jason) Modified to reflect fee paid paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3156879(SLW).
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney Christine M. Adams to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Virginia Darden, Dany Saar, Itzhara Saar, Roy Tromboli, Drake Whitehurst. (Sutton, Jason) Modified to reflect paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3156876 (SLW).
September 19, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Sutton, Jason)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 Filed in error: MOTION for Attorney Yasmin Cader to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3156879) by Virginia Darden, Dany Saar, Itzhara Saar, Roy Tromboli, Drake Whitehurst. (Sutton, Jason) Modified on 9/23/2019 (SLW).
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Filed in error: MOTION for Attorney Christine M. Adams to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3156876) by Virginia Darden, Dany Saar, Itzhara Saar, Roy Tromboli, Drake Whitehurst. (Sutton, Jason) Modified on 9/23/2019 (SLW).
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jessica Shay Morgan for The Kingdom Trust Company. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/17/2019. (CLR)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Jessica Shay Morgan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3154166) by The Kingdom Trust Company. (Roche, Vincent)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley R. Brost on behalf of The Kingdom Trust Company. (Brost, Ashley)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent M. Roche on behalf of The Kingdom Trust Company. (Roche, Vincent)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to The Kingdom Trust Company. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX400050779) filed by Drake Whitehurst, Danny Saar, Roy Tromboli, Virginia Darden, Itzhara Saar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Traditional IRA Custodial Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Kingdom Trust Letter, #3 Exhibit C - August 23, 2019 Email, #4 Exhibit D - August 23, 2019 Email re Termination, #5 Exhibit E - The Kingdom Trust Crypto Asset Self-Directed IRA - FAQ) (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitehurst et al v. The Kingdom Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kingdom Trust Company
Represented By: Ashley R. Brost
Represented By: Jessica Shay Morgan
Represented By: Vincent M. Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Tromboli
Represented By: Jason R. Sutton
Represented By: Christine M. Adams
Represented By: Yasmin Cader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Darden
Represented By: Jason R. Sutton
Represented By: Christine M. Adams
Represented By: Yasmin Cader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Itzhara Saar
Represented By: Jason R. Sutton
Represented By: Christine M. Adams
Represented By: Yasmin Cader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Saar
Represented By: Jason R. Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drake Whitehurst
Represented By: Jason R. Sutton
Represented By: Christine M. Adams
Represented By: Yasmin Cader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dany Saar
Represented By: Jason R. Sutton
Represented By: Christine M. Adams
Represented By: Yasmin Cader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?