Gage Bros. Concrete Products, Inc. v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gage Bros. Concrete Products, Inc.
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv04166
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/30/2020, Motions due by 10/1/2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/4/2019. (CLR)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 Discovery Report re #5 Order for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information by Cincinnati Insurance Company. Related document: #5 Order for Discovery Report.(Haigh, Mark)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lawrence Tooth for Cincinnati Insurance Company. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/29/19. (JLS)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Gage Bros. Concrete Products, Inc.. (Clarke, Justin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Gage Bros. Concrete Products, Inc.. (Clarke, Justin)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney Laurence J.W. Tooth to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3171560) by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Haigh, Mark)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Dennis M. Dolan for Cincinnati Insurance Company,Dennis M. Dolan for Cincinnati Insurance Company. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/9/2019. (JLS)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Dennis M. Dolan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3169127) by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Haigh, Mark)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Judge Piersol to Counsel)(JLS)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Gage Bros. Concrete Products, Inc. by Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Copy of Policy) (Haigh, Mark)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Cincinnati Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Haigh, Mark)
September 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Cincinnati Insurance Company to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal documents)(Haigh, Mark)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cincinnati Insurance Company from the Second Judicial Circuit, Minnehaha County, case number 49 CIV. 19-2592. ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3161340) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - August 27, 2019 Justin T. Clarke to South Dakota Division of Insurance with Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Admission of Service executed by South Dakota Division of Insurance)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gage Bros. Concrete Products, Inc. v. Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gage Bros. Concrete Products, Inc.
Represented By: Justin T. Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark W. Haigh
Represented By: Lawrence Tooth
Represented By: Dennis M. Dolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?