Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc. v. Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc.
Defendant: Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc. and South Dakota Medical Holding Company, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04171
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Discovery Report. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/12/2019. (SAC)
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc.. (Rasmussen, Reed)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by South Dakota Medical Holding Company, Inc.. (Sudbeck, Roger)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger A. Sudbeck on behalf of South Dakota Medical Holding Company, Inc.. (Sudbeck, Roger)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc.. (Lovrien, Brett)
October 16, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #8 Waiver of Service Executed was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Lovrien, Brett)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc.. Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc. waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (SAC)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc., Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc. waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Lovrien, Brett) Modified on 10/16/2019 (CLR).
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc.. (Lovrien, Brett)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey T. Sveen on behalf of Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc.. (Sveen, Jeffrey)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Reed A. Rasmussen on behalf of Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc.. (Rasmussen, Reed)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc.. South Dakota Medical Holding Company, Inc. waiver sent on 10/1/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Lovrien, Brett)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc. of Lawsuit and Request to Waiver Service of Summons. (Lovrien, Brett)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc., South Dakota Medical Holding Company, Inc. 2 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3163316) filed by Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc. in shell case on 9/30/2019. (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc. v. Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brentwood Hutterian, Brethren, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Sveen
Represented By: Reed A. Rasmussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Dakota Medical Holding Company, Inc.
Represented By: Roger A. Sudbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Select Specialty Hospital - Sioux Falls, Inc.
Represented By: Brett A. Lovrien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?