Sharp v. Fluke et al
Petitioner: Anthony Keenan Sharp
Respondent: Warden Fluke and Jason Ravnsborg
Case Number: 4:2019cv04173
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing Fee Received from Anthony Keenan Sharp. Fee Amount: $5.00, Receipt No.: #SDX300003352. (MSB)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254), #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #7 MOTION to DISMISS , #11 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Objections to R&R due by 12/2/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 11/18/2019. (CG)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Anthony Keenan Sharp. (Attachments: #1 Request for Production, #2 Request for Admission) (SLW) (Main Document 11 replaced on 11/15/2019) (SLW).
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT by Petitioner Anthony Keenan Sharp re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). (SLW)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Anthony Keenan Sharp. (SLW)
November 4, 2019 RECEIVED Minnehaha County Clerk of Courts: Criminal cases 14-8084 and 15-4360; Civil case 18-157. Supreme Court Records 27927 and 28026. The records are located on Clerk of Court N Drive. (SLW)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Fluke, Jason Ravnsborg. (Wald, Sherri)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS by Fluke, Jason Ravnsborg. (Wald, Sherri)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anthony Keenan Sharp. (SLW)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR SERVICE AND TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 11/8/2019. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/8/2019. (CG)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (document was in middle of the attachments) by Anthony Keenan Sharp. (SLW)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 together with a Prisoner Trust Account Report. Although a new case has been opened, you need to complete the enclosed Motion to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration. Copy of docket sheet and IFP Motion sent to petitioner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. (SLW)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SLW)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 filed by Anthony Keenan Sharp. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (SLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharp v. Fluke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Fluke
Represented By: Sherri Sundem Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jason Ravnsborg
Represented By: Sherri Sundem Wald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Keenan Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?