Storm v. City of Brookings
Plaintiff: Aaron Storm
Defendant: City of Brookings
Case Number: 4:2019cv04175
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/19/2019. (LH)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Brookings. (Garry, William)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant City of Brookings on 10-30-2019, RETURN OF SERVICE as to City of Brookings served on 10-30-2019. (Falon, Shannon)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Brookings. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(SLT)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3172651) filed by Aaron Storm in shell case on 10/15/2019. (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Storm v. City of Brookings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Storm
Represented By: Shannon R. Falon
Represented By: Pamela R. Reiter
Represented By: Anthony P. Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Brookings
Represented By: William C. Garry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?