Brockel v. Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kamber Brockel
Defendant: Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Farm Bureau Financial Services
Case Number: 4:2019cv04176
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 11/25/19. (JLS)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (O'Leary, Mark)
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company Unopposed. (O'Leary, Mark)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (O'Leary, Mark)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. O'Leary on behalf of Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (O'Leary, Mark)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Kamber Brockel. (Johnson, Steven)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company. 1 Summmons, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO85)(JLS)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3177762) filed by Kamber Brockel in shell case on 10/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Accident Report, #2 Ex B - Farm Bureau Correspondence) (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brockel v. Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark D. O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farm Bureau Financial Services
Represented By: Mark D. O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamber Brockel
Represented By: Shannon R. Falon
Represented By: Steven M. Johnson
Represented By: Sara E. Show
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?