Dullerud v. Korthals
Plaintiff: Rosalyn Dora Dullerud
Defendant: Aaron David Korthals
Case Number: 4:2019cv04192
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Aaron David Korthals. One Summmons(es), Rule 73 Memo and AO 85 for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO85)(DJP)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Rosalyn Dora Dullerud. (Lanham, Kimberly)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Aaron David Korthals served on 12/12/2019. (Lanham, Kimberly)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aaron David Korthals. 1 Summmons, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Aaron David Korthals, #2 AO85 Form)(JLS)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS (Dullerud vs. Korthals). (Lanham, Kimberly)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3206612) filed by Rosalyn Dora Dullerud in shell case on 12/03/19. (DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dullerud v. Korthals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron David Korthals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalyn Dora Dullerud
Represented By: A. Russell Janklow
Represented By: Kimberly J. Lanham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?