Beresford v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Todd Beresford
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc. and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04194
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/23/2020 Motions due by 11/20/2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 01/16/2020. (KLE)
January 16, 2020 Filing 33 Discovery Report (Joint) by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc..(Goldstein, David)
January 6, 2020 Filing 32 AMENDED ORDER granting #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paige Fiedler. (CLR)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paige Fielder. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 01/03/2020. (KLE)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Amy R. Beck. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 01/03/2020. (KLE)
January 2, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Attorney Paige Fiedler to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3226746) by Todd Beresford. (Sutton, Anthony)
January 2, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Attorney Amy Beck to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3226729) by Todd Beresford. (Sutton, Anthony)
December 19, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Russell Janklow on behalf of Todd Beresford. (Janklow, A.)
December 19, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon R. Falon on behalf of Todd Beresford. (Falon, Shannon)
December 19, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony P. Sutton on behalf of Todd Beresford. (Sutton, Anthony)
December 19, 2019 NOTICE of Filing Error: #24 Notice of Appearance was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Sutton, Anthony)
December 19, 2019 Filing 24 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony P. Sutton on behalf of Todd Beresford. (Sutton, Anthony) Modified text on 12/20/2019 (JLS).
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/18/2019. (KLE)
December 17, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.. (Goldstein, David)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eva C. Madison. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/9/2019. (CLR)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Maggie Benson. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/9/2019. (CLR)
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney Eva C. Madison to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3211087) by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.. (Goldstein, David)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney Maggie Benson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3211077) by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.. (Goldstein, David)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Goldstein on behalf of All Defendants. (Goldstein, David)
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 PHV LETTER with enclosed AO 85 form sent by Clerk's Office to Amy Beck, Paige Fiedler, Jeannie DeVeney, Eva Madison, Maggie Benson. (KLE)
December 4, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Iowa Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00349. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Change Venue; granting #8 Motion to Dismiss. Counts 1, 2 and 3 of the complaint are dismissed. The court transfers Count 4 to the United States Distrct Court for the District of South Dakota. Signed by Chief Judge John A. Jarvey on 12/3/2019. (mem) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/4/2019.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (Madison, Eva) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/4/2019.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.(Madison, Eva) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/4/2019.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY re #7 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the District of South Dakota, Southern Division filed by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.(Madison, Eva) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/4/2019.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the District of South Dakota, Southern Division filed by Todd Beresford. Replies due by 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit of Todd Beresford, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Beck, Amy) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/4/2019.]
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Todd Beresford. Replies due by 11/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Affidavit of Todd Beresford)(Beck, Amy) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/4/2019.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. Responses due by 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - SOS IBP Information, #3 Exhibit B - ICRC Charge)(Madison, Eva) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/4/2019.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Change Venue to the United States District Court for the District of South Dakota, Southern Division by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.Motions referred to Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Responses due by 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Article)(Benson, Maggie) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/4/2019.]
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Eva C. Madison; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Maggie Benson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 10/30/2019. (slg) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/4/2019.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3963797 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (Benson, Maggie) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/4/2019.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3963786 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. (Madison, Eva) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/4/2019.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 11/29/2019. (sjc) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/4/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice to Plaintiff of Filing of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(DeVeney, Jeannie) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/4/2019.]
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc. from Iowa District Court for Polk County, case number LACL145835. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3962006., filed by Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(DeVeney, Jeannie) [Transferred from Iowa Southern on 12/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beresford v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Beresford
Represented By: Paige Ellen Fiedler
Represented By: Amy Rachelle Beck
Represented By: Shannon R. Falon
Represented By: Amy R. Beck
Represented By: Paige E. Fiedler
Represented By: Anthony P. Sutton
Represented By: A. Russell Janklow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Jeannie M DeVeney
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Represented By: Maggie Benson
Represented By: David J. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Represented By: Jeannie M DeVeney
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Represented By: Maggie Benson
Represented By: David J. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?