Commercial State Bank of Wagner v. Big Iron Auction Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Commercial State Bank of Wagner
Defendant: Big Iron Auction Company, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04008
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF by Defendant Big Iron Auction Company, Inc. re #2 MOTION to DISMISS Plainitff's Complaint (Fischer, Daniel)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Commercial State Bank of Wagner identifying Corporate Parent Commercial Holding Company for Commercial State Bank of Wagner. (Feist, Jordan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION to DISMISS Plainitff's Complaint filed by Commercial State Bank of Wagner. (Feist, Jordan)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Big Iron Auction Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent R & M Holdings, Inc. for Big Iron Auction Company, Inc.. (Fischer, Daniel)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 BRIEF by Defendant Big Iron Auction Company, Inc. re #2 MOTION to DISMISS Plainitff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract, #2 Exhibit Lien Release) (Fischer, Daniel)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to DISMISS Plainitff's Complaint by Big Iron Auction Company, Inc.. (Fischer, Daniel)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Big Iron Auction Company, Inc. from Charles-Mix County, case number CIV 19-4. ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3233664) (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 State case docket and documents)(MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commercial State Bank of Wagner v. Big Iron Auction Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commercial State Bank of Wagner
Represented By: Jordan J. Feist
Represented By: Roger W. Damgaard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Iron Auction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?