Wilson v. Kleinsasser et al
Plaintiff: Tamara Wilson
Defendant: Matthew Kleinsasser and Irina Kleinsasser
Case Number: 4:2020cv04009
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (E.R.I.S.A.)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim REPLY IN SUPPORT filed by All Defendants. (Trzynka, Robert)
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF by Plaintiff Tamara Wilson in Opposition to #5 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim (Johnson, Thomas) Modified on 2/19/2020 to add text (SKK).
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kelsey E. B. Knoer terminated. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/14/2020. (CLR)
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Tamara Wilson. (Knoer, Kelsey)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, AO85, Civil Cover Sheet served on Matthew Kleinsasser on 01/27/2020, filed by Tamara Wilson. (Knoer, Kelsey)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service (Summons, Complaint, AO 85 and Civil Cover Sheet) served on Irina Kleinsasser on 01/16/2020, filed by Tamara Wilson. (Knoer, Kelsey) Modified Docket Text per the request of the law firm on 1/31/2020 (DLC).
January 29, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Trzynka, Robert)
January 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Irina Kleinsasser, Matthew Kleinsasser. (Trzynka, Robert)
January 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Trzynka on behalf of All Defendants. (Trzynka, Robert)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 1 Summmons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR)
January 14, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Tamara Wilson. (Knoer, Kelsey)
January 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3235738) filed by Tamara Wilson in shell case on 1/14/2020. (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Kleinsasser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Kleinsasser
Represented By: Robert D. Trzynka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irina Kleinsasser
Represented By: Robert D. Trzynka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Wilson
Represented By: Thomas L. Johnson
Represented By: Kelsey E. B. Knoer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?