Walker v. Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation
Plaintiff: Lorne Walker
Defendant: Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv04038
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/1/2020. Motions due by 12/15/2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 3/30/2020. (JLS)
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 FORM 52 REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting Jointly Submitted by Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation.(Steinhoff, Eric)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Discovery Report. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 02/28/2020. (MSB)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation. (Steinhoff, Eric)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation from Minnehaha County ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3268485) (Attachments: #1 State Complaint)(MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorne Walker
Represented By: Bret Chancelor Merkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burlington Coat Factory Warehouse Corporation
Represented By: Eric J. Steinhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?