Wex Bank v. Cox Transfer, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wex Bank
Defendant: Cox Transfer, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04051
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Wex Bank. (Dougherty, Patrick)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Howard M. Levine. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 03/31/2020. (SAC)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney Howard Levine to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3289963) by Wex Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dougherty, Patrick)
March 26, 2020 NOTICE of Filing Error: #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Dougherty, Patrick)
March 25, 2020 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Attorney Howard Levine to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3287695) by Wex Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dougherty, Patrick) Modified on 3/26/2020 (CLR).
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 Amended Summons Issued as to Cox Transfer, Inc. 1 Summons delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (SLT)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS(ES) by Wex Bank. (Dougherty, Patrick)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by Wex Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit Aged Accounts receivable Report, #3 Exhibit Financing Statement, #4 Exhibit UCC Summary Report) (Dougherty, Patrick)
March 20, 2020 NOTICE of Filing Error: #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Dougherty, Patrick)
March 20, 2020 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS(ES) by Wex Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit Aged Accounts Receivable Report, #3 Exhibit Financing Statement, #4 Exhibit UCC Summary Report, #5 Proposed Summons)(Dougherty, Patrick) Modified on 3/20/2020 (SLT).
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cox Transfer, Inc. 1 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85 Form)(SAC) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/19/2020 to attach signed summons) (SAC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wex Bank v. Cox Transfer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wex Bank
Represented By: Patrick T. Dougherty
Represented By: Howard M. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cox Transfer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?