Steffen et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Cathy Steffen, Robert V Steffen and Robert V. Steffen
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2020cv04057
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tyler D. Coombe. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 05/08/2020. (LH)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Harrison J. Meyers. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 05/08/2020. (LH)
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney Tyler D. Coombe to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3310641) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Warner, Alexis)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Harrison J. Meyers to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3310626) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Warner, Alexis)
April 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis A. Warner on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Warner, Alexis)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Beck, William)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William G. Beck on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Beck, William)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 [FILED IN ERROR] NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis A. Warner on behalf of Cathy Steffen, Robert V Steffen. (Warner, Alexis) Modified on 4/14/2020 to add text (KLE).
April 14, 2020 NOTICE of Filing Error: #7 Notice of Appearance was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Warner, Alexis)
March 27, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-04216. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 27, 2020 NOTICE: The parties are to respond with a notice of designation of the contents of the record to be remanded. (SKK)
March 27, 2020 CLERK'S TEXT LETTER TO NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY(S) Local Rule 83.2 (E) allows attorneys to appear pro hac vice (PHV) if they associate with local counsel. The rule provides, in relevant part, that '[a]n attorney who is not a member of the bar of this court, but who is a member in good standing of the bar of another United States District Court, may, upon motion and approval by the court, participate in the conduct of a particular case, but such motion may be allowed only if the applicant associates with a member in good standing of the bar of this court as local counsel.' Local counsel must sign and file all documents, and must be present in court during all proceedings unless otherwise ordered. The court's local rules are available on the district court's website located at www.sdd.uscourts.gov.To apply for admission PHV, complete the Motion for Admission PHV form found on our website under 'Local Forms' and submit it to local counsel for electronic filing. The PHV fee is $100. Local counsel may pay the fee electronically by using Pay.gov.Docket sheet mailed/emailed to non-resident attorney(s) (SKK)
March 27, 2020 REMARK: Case Transferred to the District of South Dakota via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER - SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B]. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED ORDER - AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-04216-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16986352 filed by Cathy Steffen, Robert V Steffen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steffen et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Steffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert V Steffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert V. Steffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Alexis A. Warner
Represented By: Harrison J. Meyers
Represented By: Tyler D. Coombe
Represented By: William G. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Alexis A. Warner
Represented By: Harrison J. Meyers
Represented By: Tyler D. Coombe
Represented By: William G. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?