Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers of Sioux Falls, Inc. v. Crossroads Trailer Sales & Service, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers of Sioux Falls, Inc.
Defendant: David Jensen, Taylor Larson, Chaz Koherst, Nick Big Eagle, Tracy Thompson, Mark Sneve, Alvin Scholten, Michael Falor, Derek Falor and Crossroads Trailer Sales & Service, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04058
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE by Mark Sneve OF UNOPPOSED EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT. (Arndt, Mark)
May 13, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Arndt on behalf of Mark Sneve. (Arndt, Mark)
May 13, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Tracy Thompson . (Schulte, Eric)
May 13, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane E. Eden on behalf of Tracy Thompson. (Eden, Shane)
May 13, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric C. Schulte on behalf of Tracy Thompson. (Schulte, Eric)
May 13, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Fritz, II on behalf of Derek Falor. (Fritz, Daniel)
May 12, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Nick Big Eagle, Chaz Koherst . (Prostrollo, Lisa)
May 12, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M. Prostrollo on behalf of Nick Big Eagle, Chaz Koherst, Taylor Larson. (Prostrollo, Lisa)
May 12, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Derek Falor Notice of Unopposed Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. (Fritz, Daniel)
May 12, 2020 Filing 27 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Crossroads Trailer Sales & Service, Inc.. (Cutler, Kent)
May 11, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Alvin Scholten UNOPPED EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT. (Landon, Stephen)
May 11, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C. Landon on behalf of Alvin Scholten. (Landon, Stephen)
May 11, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Derek Falor . (Nelsen, Derek)
May 11, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric T. Preheim on behalf of Michael Falor. (Preheim, Eric)
May 11, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek A. Nelsen on behalf of Michael Falor. (Nelsen, Derek)
May 11, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly R. Wassink on behalf of Crossroads Trailer Sales & Service, Inc.. (Wassink, Kimberly)
May 11, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Kent R. Cutler on behalf of Crossroads Trailer Sales & Service, Inc.. (Cutler, Kent)
May 8, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by David Jensen . (Shattuck, Timothy)
May 8, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy R. Shattuck on behalf of David Jensen. (Shattuck, Timothy)
May 6, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers of Sioux Falls, Inc.. Tracy Thompson served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020. (O'Hara, Gillian)
May 6, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers of Sioux Falls, Inc.. Nick Big Eagle served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020. (O'Hara, Gillian)
May 6, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers of Sioux Falls, Inc.. Michael Falor served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020. (O'Hara, Gillian)
May 6, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers of Sioux Falls, Inc.. Mark Sneve served on 4/23/2020, answer due 5/14/2020. (O'Hara, Gillian)
May 6, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers of Sioux Falls, Inc.. Derek Falor served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020. (O'Hara, Gillian)
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers of Sioux Falls, Inc.. David Jensen served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020. (O'Hara, Gillian)
May 6, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers of Sioux Falls, Inc.. Chaz Koherst served on 4/24/2020, answer due 5/15/2020. (O'Hara, Gillian)
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers of Sioux Falls, Inc.. Alvin Scholten served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020. (O'Hara, Gillian)
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Crossroads Trailer Sales & Service, Inc.. Crossroads Trailer Sales & Service, Inc. waiver sent on 4/22/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Cutler, Kent)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers of Sioux Falls, Inc.. Taylor Larson served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (O'Hara, Gillian)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers of Sioux Falls, Inc.. Nick Big Eagle served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (O'Hara, Gillian)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers of Sioux Falls, Inc.. Derek Falor served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (O'Hara, Gillian)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers of Sioux Falls, Inc.. Chaz Koherst served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (O'Hara, Gillian)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers of Sioux Falls, Inc.. Crossroads Trailer Sales & Service, Inc. served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (O'Hara, Gillian)
March 30, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 10 Summonses delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Rule 73 Memo and AO 85 form previously docketed on 3/27/20 at doc #2 ) (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Chaz Kohorst, #2 Summons Issued - Crossroads Trailer Sales and Service, Inc., #3 Summons Issued - David Jensen, #4 Summons Issued - Derek Falor, #5 Summons Issued - Mark Sneve, #6 Summons Issued - Michael Falor, #7 Summons Issued - Nick Big Eagle, #8 Summons Issued - Taylor Larson, #9 Summons Issued - Tracy Thompson)(JLS)
March 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE regarding Rule 73 Memo. (Attachments: #1 AO-85)(CLR)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3289672) filed by Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers of Sioux Falls, Inc. (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers of Sioux Falls, Inc. v. Crossroads Trailer Sales & Service, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Jensen
Represented By: Timothy R. Shattuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Larson
Represented By: Lisa M. Prostrollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaz Koherst
Represented By: Lisa M. Prostrollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Big Eagle
Represented By: Lisa M. Prostrollo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Thompson
Represented By: Shane E. Eden
Represented By: Eric C. Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Sneve
Represented By: Mark J. Arndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Scholten
Represented By: Stephen C. Landon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Falor
Represented By: Derek A. Nelsen
Represented By: Eric T. Preheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Falor
Represented By: Daniel R. Fritz, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossroads Trailer Sales & Service, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly R. Wassink
Represented By: Kent R. Cutler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Hawk Truck-Trailers of Sioux Falls, Inc.
Represented By: Gillian G. O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?