Albrecht et al v. Tesla Transport Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Heather Albrecht and Jasen Albrecht
Defendant: Tesla Transport Inc. and Peace Express, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04065
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/16/2020; Motions due by 12/1/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 06/03/2020. (LH)
May 29, 2020 Filing 17 Discovery Report Joint by Heather Albrecht, Jasen Albrecht.(Oberg, Steven)
May 27, 2020 Filing 16 Defendant's ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, of Plaintiffs by All Defendants. (Jencks, David)
May 26, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #11 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Heather Albrecht, Jasen Albrecht. (Oberg, Steven)
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by Jasen Albrecht, Heather Albrecht. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Advertisement, #2 Exhibit B - Invoices, #3 Exhibit C - Accident report, #4 Exhibit D - Photographs, #5 Exhibit E - Draft from Tesla) (Oberg, Steven)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion to File Amended Complaint and directing that Plaintiff forthwith file the Amended Complaint and serve Defendant therewith. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 5/22/20. (Lange, Roberto)
May 21, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Heather Albrecht, Jasen Albrecht. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Complaint) (Oberg, Steven)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM of Defendant Tesla Transport, Inc. against All Plaintiffs by All Defendants. (Jencks, David)
May 15, 2020 Filing 10 ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on Peace Express on May 11, 2020, filed by Heather Albrecht, Jasen Albrecht. (Oberg, Steven) Modified Docket Text on 5/18/2020 (DLC).
May 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Peace Express, Inc., Tesla Transport Inc. Rule 7.1 Disclosure of Defendant Tesla Transport, Inc.. (Jencks, David)
May 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Peace Express, Inc., Tesla Transport Inc. Rule 7.1 Disclosure of Defendant Peace Express, Inc.. (Jencks, David)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 05/05/2020. (LH)
May 4, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Jason Albrecht and Heather Albrecht by Tesla Transport Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Receipt) (Jencks, David) Modified Docket Text on 5/5/2020 (DLC).
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Jencks on behalf of All Defendants. (Jencks, David)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Tesla Transport on April 21, 2020, filed by Heather Albrecht, Jasen Albrecht. (Oberg, Steven)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Peace Express, Inc., Tesla Transport Inc.. 2 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued - Tesla, #2 Summons Issued - Peace Express, #3 AO 85)(DLC)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Heather Albrecht, Jasen Albrecht. (Oberg, Steven)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3299110) filed by Jasen Albrecht, Heather Albrecht. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Advertisement, #2 Exhibit B - Invoices, #3 Exhibit C - Accident Report, #4 Exhibit D - Photographs, #5 Exhibit E - Copy of Draft) (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albrecht et al v. Tesla Transport Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Albrecht
Represented By: Steven J. Oberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasen Albrecht
Represented By: Steven J. Oberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla Transport Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peace Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?