Cook v. State Auto Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Richard J. Cook
Defendant: State Auto Insurance Company and Milbank Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv04067
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/15/2021; Motions due by 2/19/2021. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/12/2020. (DJP)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 26 Disclosures by Richard J. Cook (Joyce, Meghann)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 6/3/2020. (DJP)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Milbank Insurance Company, State Auto Insurance Company. (Garry, William)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard J. Cook. All Defendants. (Joyce, Meghann)
April 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to Plaintiff re Rule 73 (Attachments: #1 AO85)(DJP)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3300105) filed by Richard J. Cook. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Policy, #2 Ex B - Structural Engineering Report, #3 Ex C - City Glass & Glazing Invoice, #4 Ex D - Partial Estimate, #5 Ex E - Addendum to Estimate, #6 Ex F - Denial, #7 Ex G - Plaintiff's correspondence, #8 Ex H - Defendants' correspondence) (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook v. State Auto Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Auto Insurance Company
Represented By: William C. Garry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milbank Insurance Company
Represented By: William C. Garry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard J. Cook
Represented By: Christopher D. Sommers
Represented By: Meghann M. Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?