Mummau v. Wanzek Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Mummau
Defendant: Wanzek Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04092
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on August 10, 2020. (DLC)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Client Services Agreement) (Shultz, John)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wanzek Construction, Inc. answer due 8/10/2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on July 27, 2020. (DLC)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Second) by Wanzek Construction, Inc.. (Shultz, John)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wanzek Construction, Inc. answer due 8/3/2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on July 20, 2020. (DLC)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel E. Engel, III on behalf of Wanzek Construction, Inc.. (Engel, Joel)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Wanzek Construction, Inc.. (Shultz, John)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Shultz on behalf of Wanzek Construction, Inc.. (Shultz, John)
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Wanzek Construction, Inc. on 06/22/2020 (Lanham, Kimberly)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Wanzek Construction, Inc, Summons, Rule 73 Memo and AO 85 for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO85)(DJP)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3336421) filed by David Mummau. (DJP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mummau v. Wanzek Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanzek Construction, Inc.
Represented By: John G. Shultz
Represented By: Joel E. Engel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mummau
Represented By: A. Russell Janklow
Represented By: Jami J. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?