Ward v. Cox
Petitioner: Darnell Ward
Respondent: J.W. Cox
Case Number: 4:2020cv04098
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan K. Roche on behalf of J.W. Cox. (Roche, Meghan)
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Sasha Labrenz re #11 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #10 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 3/26/20 Memo., #2 Exhibit B - 4/3/20 Memo., #3 Exhibit C - 4/22/20 Memo., #4 Exhibit D - 5/8/20 Memo, #5 Exhibit E - Public Information Inmate Data) (Ramsdell, Alison)
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by J.W. Cox. (Ramsdell, Alison)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by J.W. Cox. (Ramsdell, Alison)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 7/24/2020. (CG) Mailed to Ward on 7/24/2020 (SLW).
July 23, 2020 RECEIPT of Initial Partial Filing Fee from Darnell Ward. Amount Paid: $5.00. Receipt No.: SDX400052757. (VMM)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (MSB)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison J. Ramsdell on behalf of J.W. Cox. (Ramsdell, Alison)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 Certified Mail Receipt for the US Attorney General and Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons. (MSB)
July 7, 2020 TEXT CERTIFICATE OF CLERK - The Clerk has served an AO85 and a copy/copies of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2241), #5 Order on the Respondent and the following: - United States Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20530-0001, via certified mail, return receipt requested; - Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons, 320 First St., NW, Washington, DC 20534, via certified mail, return receipt requested; - Diana Ryan, Assistant United States Attorney for the District of South Dakota, Civil Division, via Interoffice Mailbox in Sioux Falls. (SLW) Modified text on 7/7/2020 (SST). Mailed to petitioner with AO 85 on 7/7/2020 (SLW).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing service upon respondent. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 7/6/2020. (CG) Mailed to Petitioner on 7/6/2020 (SLW).
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 together with a Motion to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration. Although a new case has been opened, your motion to proceed without prepayment of fees may be denied unless you return the enclosed Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.) Copy of docket sheet and Prisoner Trust Account Report sent to petitioner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (MSB)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darnell Ward. (MSB)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Memorandum of Law Supporting #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2241) by Petitioner Darnell Ward (MSB)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2241 filed by Darnell Ward. (MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Darnell Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J.W. Cox
Represented By: Alison J. Ramsdell
Represented By: Meghan K. Roche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?