Roberson v. Cox
Petitioner: Orlandon Roberson
Respondent: JW Cox
Case Number: 4:2020cv04109
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Timothy Downing re #13 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim , #14 Memorandum in Support of Motion . (Ryan, Diana)
September 2, 2020 NOTICE of Filing Error: #16 Declaration was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Ryan, Diana)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 FILED IN ERROR - DECLARATION of Timothy Downing re #13 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim , #14 Memorandum in Support of Motion . (Ryan, Diana) Modified on 9/2/2020 (SKK).
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Jill Sternhagen re #13 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim , #14 Memorandum in Support of Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 3/26/20 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit B - 4/3/20 Memorandum, #3 Exhibit C - 4/22/20 Memorandum, #4 Exhibit D - 5/8/20 Memorandum, #5 Exhibit E - Public Information Inmate Data) (Ryan, Diana)
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support re #13 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim filed by JW Cox. (Ryan, Diana)
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by JW Cox. (Ryan, Diana)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting respondent Cox's #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until September 1, 2020. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 08/18/2020. (Duffy, Veronica) Modified on 8/18/2020. Sent to Orlandon Roberson via USPS (SKK).
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or Otherwise Respond by JW Cox. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Ryan, Diana)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana J. Ryan on behalf of JW Cox. (Ryan, Diana)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT for Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons and US Attorney General. (CLR)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison J. Ramsdell on behalf of JW Cox. (Ramsdell, Alison)
July 30, 2020 RECEIPT of Initial Partial Filing Fee from Orlandon Roberson. Amount Paid: $5.00. Receipt No.: SDX400052796. (VMM)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner shall pay the $5.00 filing fee to the clerk of court on or before August 31, 2020. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 7/28/2020. (CG) Modified on 7/28/2020. Sent to Orlandon Roberson via USPS (SKK).
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (CLR)
July 27, 2020 TEXT CERTIFICATE OF CLERK - The Clerk has served an AO85 and a copy/copies of #1 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Brief, #5 Order on the Respondent and the following: - United States Attorney General, U.S. Department of Justice, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Washington, DC 20530-0001, via certified mail, return receipt requested; - Director, Federal Bureau of Prisons, 320 First St., NW, Washington, DC 20534, via certified mail, return receipt requested; - Diana Ryan, Assistant United States Attorney for the District of South Dakota, Civil Division, via Interoffice Mailbox in Sioux Falls. (SKK)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing service upon respondent. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 7/23/2020. (CG)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Emergency Motion Seeking Injunctive Relief/T.R.O. together with a Motion to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration. Although a new case has been opened, your motion to proceed without prepayment of fees may be denied unless you return the enclosed Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.) Copy of docket sheet, instructions and forms to file 2241 Petition, and Prisoner Trust Account Report sent to petitioner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (CLR)
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 Memorandum of Law Supporting 28 USC 2241 Petition by Petitioner Orlandon Roberson. (CLR)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Orlandon Roberson. (CLR)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 Emergency MOTION seeking Injunctive Relief/Temporary Restraining Order by Orlandon Roberson. (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberson v. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Orlandon Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JW Cox
Represented By: Alison J. Ramsdell
Represented By: Diana J. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?