Kraft v. The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency et al
Plaintiff: Rune Kraft
Defendant: Does 1-10, The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency and Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Case Number: 4:2020cv04111
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to DISMISS filed by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Fritz, Daniel)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to DISMISS by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Fritz, Daniel)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rune Kraft (Kraft, Rune)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association answer due 9/25/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 08/25/2020. (LH)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by Rune Kraft. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of process server) (Kraft, Rune)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Fritz, II on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Fritz, Daniel)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Fritz, Daniel)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Fritz, Daniel)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rune Kraft. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Kraft, Rune)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rune Kraft. The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency served on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Kraft, Rune)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Electronically File Documents in CM/ECF. The Clerks Office shall arrange to train the pro se filer on how to e-file documents and issue the pro se filer a CM/ECF login and password after the training is completed. The ability of the pro se filer to e-file documents may be revoked anytime the Court deems it justified. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 08/06/2020. (SAC)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. 2 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo and AO 85s for each party delivered to Pro Se party via electronic delivery. A copy of Fed.R.Civ.P.4 emailed to Pro Se party. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO85)(MSB)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Electronically File Documents. Pro se party Rune Kraft will now receive electronic notice of unsealed documents filed in this case, but must wait for a Court ruling regarding e-filing. Refer to the CM/ECF User Manual located on the court website at www.sdd.uscourts.gov for information about accessing documents. (DJP)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with the filing fee and no summons(es). A new case has been opened. We are unable to issue summon(es) at this time. Enclosed is a blank summons form and a sample completed summons form. Follow the enclosed instructions to properly complete your summons(es). As soon as the Clerks Office receives your properly completed summons(es), it/they will be issued. Copy of docket sheet, blank summons form, and sample completed summons form with instructions sent to plaintiff and Rule 4. CM/ECF Pro Se Litigant Application Form also sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (SAC)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MISCELLANEOUS SUBMISSION (Motion to Allow Electronic Filing) by Plaintiff Rune Kraft. MAILED a copy of our form to electronically file to Plaintiff via USPS. (SAC)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, ($400.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX400052793) filed by Rune Kraft. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (SAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kraft v. The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Office of the Comptroller of the Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Daniel R. Fritz, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rune Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?