Edwards v. Cox et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Edwards
Defendant: Dr. Rock Boyd, Dr. William Pierce, Legal Dept L. Allen, Unit Mgr J. Sternhagen, Counselor S. Mertens, Nurse Carla Steppad, Case Mgr S. Thygeson and J.W. Cox
Case Number: 4:2020cv04130
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Timothy Edwards (SKK)
October 8, 2020 Partial Filing Fee Received from Timothy Edwards. Fee Amount: $254.74, Receipt No.: #SDX300003606. (DLC)
September 24, 2020 Partial Filing Fee Received from Timothy Edwards. Fee Amount: $47.63, Receipt No.: #SDX300003600. (DLC)
September 17, 2020 RECEIPT of Initial Partial Filing Fee from Timothy Edwards. Amount Paid: $47.63. Receipt No.: SDX300003594. (DLC)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF by Plaintiff Timothy Edwards in Support of #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983) (SKK)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Requiring Plaintiff to Pay an Initial Partial Filing Fee. Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $47.63 is due by 10/1/2020. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 9/2/20. Sent to Plaintiff and Yankton FPC via USPS. (SKK)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint together with an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury and Prisoner Trust Account Report. A new case has been opened. Copy of docket sheet sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (SKK)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SKK)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION Requesting Expert Testimony by Timothy Edwards. (SKK)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Discovery by Timothy Edwards. (SKK)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for USM 285 Forms for Service by Timothy Edwards. (SKK)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 INTRODUCTION OF DISCOVERY by Plaintiff Timothy Edwards (SKK)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Edwards. (SKK)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Timothy Edwards re #1 Complaint - Prisoner Civil Rights (42:1983). (SKK)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights filed by Timothy Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Attachments) (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Cox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Rock Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. William Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legal Dept L. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit Mgr J. Sternhagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Counselor S. Mertens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Carla Steppad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Case Mgr S. Thygeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.W. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?