Scott v. Carpenter et al
Plaintiff: La'Shane Donyale Scott and La
Defendant: Nurse Kelley, Nursing Supervisor Jessica, Nurse LeAnn, Nurse Rachael Tyez, Dr. Regier, Dr. Mary Carpenter, PA Manson and Nurse Rachael Tycz
Case Number: 4:2020cv04135
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 7 Summons(es), #9 , #10 for each party delivered to usms via email. (SLT)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED ORDER re #13 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/3/2020. (SLT) Modified on 11/3/2020 Delivered to La'shane Scott and SDSP Financial department via usps (SLT).
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying as moot #11 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/2/2020. Delivered to La'shane Scott and SDSP Financial department via usps. (SLT)
October 26, 2020 Filing 12 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SLT)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by La'Shane Donyale Scott. (SLT)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SCREENING CASE and denying #8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/23/2020. (CLR) Modified on 10/23/2020 delivered with Service Letter, sample summons & USM 285 form, blank summonses, blank USM 285 forms, Rule 73 Memo and AO 85 via USPS (CLR).
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by La'Shane Donyale Scott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Cover Letter) (SLT)
October 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by La'Shane Donyale Scott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (SLT)
October 20, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by La'Shane Donyale Scott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Cover Letter) (SLT) Modified on 10/21/2020 (SLT).
October 16, 2020 Filing Fee Received from La'Shane Donyale Scott. Fee Amount: $34.08, Receipt No.: #SDX500006448. (SLT)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER Received from La Shane D. Scott to Clerk's Office. (SLT)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 9/29/2020. Delivered to La'Shane Donyale Scott and SDSP Financial Department via usps. (SLT)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by La'Shane Donyale Scott. (SLT)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint. Although a new case has been opened, your case cannot proceed further until you either pay the filing fee OR complete and return the enclosed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury. Copy of docket sheet, and Application to Proceed IFP, sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (SLT)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SLT)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights filed by La'Shane Donyale Scott. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (SLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Carpenter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La'Shane Donyale Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nursing Supervisor Jessica
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse LeAnn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Rachael Tyez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Regier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mary Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA Manson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Rachael Tycz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?