Schurman v. Warden et al
Petitioner: Stephanie Amanda Schurman
Respondent: South Dakota Attorney General and Warden
Case Number: 4:2020cv04140
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 RECEIVED Yankton County Criminal Case 18-715 and SD Supreme Court Case 29366. Records are located on Clerk of Court's N Drive. (SLW)
November 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim by Warden. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion) (Handke, Erin)
October 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin E. Handke on behalf of All Defendants. (Handke, Erin)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Stephanie Amanda Schurman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Misc State Court Documents) (SKK)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 Mail sent to Stephanie Amanda Schurman was returned as undeliverable. #3 Order was returned. It was resent at new address on 10/9/20. (SKK)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 Mail sent to Stephanie Amanda Schurman was returned as undeliverable. 5 Order was returned. Resent to updated address on 10/13/20. (SKK)
October 8, 2020 Filing Fee Received from Stephanie Amanda Schurman. Fee Amount: $5.00, Receipt No.: #SDX300003612. (DLC)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER--the petitioner and respondent should direct their responses to the court's order to show cause to petitioner's amended petition, which crossed in the mail with the court's order to show cause on the original petition. Ms. Schurman is notified that failure to respond to the order to show cause regarding exhaustion of her claims before the state courts may result in dismissal of her petition. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/07/2020. (Duffy, Veronica) Sent to Schurman via USPS on 10/7/2020 (MSB). Order sent to SD Womens Prison service group on 10/13/2020 (MSB).
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 Copy of #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 filed by Stephanie Amanda Schurman. (SKK) Modified on 10/19/2020 (SKK). Stephanie Schurman called and stated doc 4 was a copy of doc 1 and that it is not an amended petition.
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing service and order to show cause. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/5/2020. (CG) Mailed order to Schurman and emailed petition and order to SD Womens Prison service group on 10/5/2020 (MSB).
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Although a new case has been opened, your case cannot proceed further until you either pay the filing fee OR complete and return the enclosed Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration AND Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated.). Copy of docket sheet, 2254 motion, motion to proceed IFP, and Prisoner Trust Account form sent to petitioner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (SKK)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254 filed by Stephanie Amanda Schurman. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schurman v. Warden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: South Dakota Attorney General
Represented By: Erin E. Handke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Represented By: Erin E. Handke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stephanie Amanda Schurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?