Sacred Heart Health Services et al v. Midwest Medical Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Avera Heatlh & Lewis & Clark Specialty Hospital, LLC and Sacred Heart Health Services doing business as Avera Sacred Heart Hospital
Defendant: Midwest Medical Insurance Company doing business as MMIC Insurance, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv04149
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon R. Falon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Falon, Shannon)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Erin D. Doran for Midwest Medical Insurance Company. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/25/2020. (CLR)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Charles E. Spevacek for Midwest Medical Insurance Company. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/25/2020. (CLR)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney Erin D. Doran to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3434887) by Midwest Medical Insurance Company. (Hanson, Laura)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney Charles E. Spevacek to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3434874) by Midwest Medical Insurance Company. (Hanson, Laura)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Counsel)(CLR)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Midwest Medical Insurance Company. (Hanson, Laura)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stacy Deery Stennes for Avera Heatlh & Lewis & Clark Specialty Hospital, LLC, and Sacred Heart Health Services. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/6/2020. (CLR)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Taylor B. Cunningham for Avera Heatlh & Lewis & Clark Specialty Hospital, LLC, and Sacred Heart Health Services. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/6/2020. (CLR)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Midwest Medical Insurance Company . (Hanson, Laura)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura J. Hanson on behalf of Midwest Medical Insurance Company. (Hanson, Laura)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Stacy Deery Stennes to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3424148) by Avera Heatlh & Lewis & Clark Specialty Hospital, LLC, Sacred Heart Health Services. (Johnson, Steven)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Taylor B. Cunningham to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3424146) by Avera Heatlh & Lewis & Clark Specialty Hospital, LLC, Sacred Heart Health Services. (Johnson, Steven)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued Acknowledgement filed by Avera Heatlh & Lewis & Clark Specialty Hospital, LLC, Sacred Heart Health Services. (Johnson, Steven)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas J. Conlin for Avera Heatlh & Lewis & Clark Specialty Hospital, LLC, and for Sacred Heart Health Services. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/15/2020. (CLR)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney Thomas J. Conlin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3410883) by Avera Heatlh & Lewis & Clark Specialty Hospital, LLC, Sacred Heart Health Services. (Johnson, Steven)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Midwest Medical Insurance Company. 1 Summons, a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85)(CLR)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3410769, in shell case on 10/14/2020 filed by Sacred Heart Health Services, Avera Heatlh & Lewis & Clark Specialty Hospital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy SIR000002, #2 Exhibit B - LCSH Policy) (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sacred Heart Health Services et al v. Midwest Medical Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avera Heatlh & Lewis & Clark Specialty Hospital, LLC
Represented By: Sara E. Show
Represented By: Steven M. Johnson
Represented By: Thomas J. Conlin
Represented By: Shannon R. Falon
Represented By: Taylor B. Cunningham
Represented By: Stacy Deery Stennes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sacred Heart Health Services doing business as Avera Sacred Heart Hospital
Represented By: Sara E. Show
Represented By: Steven M. Johnson
Represented By: Thomas J. Conlin
Represented By: Shannon R. Falon
Represented By: Taylor B. Cunningham
Represented By: Stacy Deery Stennes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Medical Insurance Company doing business as MMIC Insurance, Inc.
Represented By: Erin D. Doran
Represented By: Charles E. Spevacek
Represented By: Laura J. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?