Sluis et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Greg Sluis and Kristen Lee Sluis
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 4:2020cv04165
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 115 RESPONSE to #114 Supplement,, Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' "Supplemental Status Report Regarding Pending Motions and MDL Rulings" filed by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis. (Haigh, Mark)
December 16, 2020 Filing 114 SUPPLEMENT by Defendants Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson Status Report Regarding Pending Motions and MDL Rulings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Memorandum Opinion and Order re Garely, #2 Exhibit B-Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order re Guelcher, #3 Exhibit C-Memorandum Opinion and Order re Dr. Guelcher, #4 Exhibit D-Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order re Raybond, #5 Exhibit E-Memorandum Opinion and Order re Raybon, #6 Exhibit F-Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order re Parisian, #7 Exhibit G-Memorandum Opinion and Order re Parisian) (Cook, Katelyn)
December 16, 2020 NOTICE of Filing Error: #112 Status Report was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Cook, Katelyn)
December 15, 2020 Filing 113 STIPULATION re #95 Order Joint Regarding MDL Pleadings and Rulings and Statement of How Parties Intend to Proceed by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Cook, Katelyn)
December 15, 2020 Filing 112 FILED IN ERROR - STATUS REPORT Defendants' Supplemental Regarding Pending Motions and MDL Rulings by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson (Cook, Katelyn) Modified on 12/17/2020 (SKK).
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #103 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alexandra K. Hughes for Greg Sluis,Alexandra K. Hughes for Kristen Lee Sluis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/25/2020. (CLR)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #104 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Anita Modak-Truran for Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/25/2020. (CLR)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #102 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sara schramm for Greg Sluis,Sara Schramm for Kristen Lee Sluis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/25/2020. (CLR)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #101 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Josh B. Wages for Greg Sluis,Josh B. Wages for Kristen Lee Sluis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/25/2020. (CLR)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting #100 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James B. Matthews, III for Greg Sluis,James B. Matthews, III for Kristen Lee Sluis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/25/2020. (CLR)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #99 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Thomas F. Hollingsworth for Greg Sluis,Thomas F. Hollingsworth for Kristen Lee Sluis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/25/2020. (CLR)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting #98 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Henry G. Garrard, III for Greg Sluis,Henry G. Garrard, III for Kristen Lee Sluis. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/25/2020. (CLR)
November 20, 2020 Filing 104 MOTION for Attorney Anita Modak-Truran to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3432691) by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Cook, Katelyn)
November 20, 2020 Filing 103 MOTION for Attorney Alexandra K. Hughes to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3432502) by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis. (Haigh, Mark)
November 20, 2020 Filing 102 MOTION for Attorney Sara Schramm to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3432501) by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis. (Haigh, Mark)
November 20, 2020 Filing 101 MOTION for Attorney Josh B. Wages to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3432499) by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis. (Haigh, Mark)
November 20, 2020 Filing 100 MOTION for Attorney James B. Matthews III to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3432498) by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis. (Haigh, Mark)
November 20, 2020 Filing 99 MOTION for Attorney Thomas F. Hollingsworth III to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3432497) by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis. (Haigh, Mark)
November 20, 2020 Filing 98 MOTION for Attorney Henry G. Garrad III to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3432488) by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis. (Haigh, Mark)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #96 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Pamela L. Ferrell for Ethicon, Inc.,Pamela L. Ferrell for Ethicon, LLC,Pamela L. Ferrell for Johnson & Johnson. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/18/2020. (SLT)
November 17, 2020 Filing 96 MOTION for Attorney Pamela L. Ferrell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3429957) by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Cook, Katelyn)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/13/2020. (SLT)
November 9, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Haigh on behalf of Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis. (Haigh, Mark)
November 2, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn A. Cook on behalf of All Defendants. (Cook, Katelyn)
November 2, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. Ashmore on behalf of All Defendants. (Ashmore, Daniel)
October 27, 2020 Filing 91 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:12-cv-04997. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 27, 2020 CLERK'S TEXT LETTER TO NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY(S) Local Rule 83.2 (E) allows attorneys to appear pro hac vice (PHV) if they associate with local counsel. The rule provides, in relevant part, that '[a]n attorney who is not a member of the bar of this court, but who is a member in good standing of the bar of another United States District Court, may, upon motion and approval by the court, participate in the conduct of a particular case, but such motion may be allowed only if the applicant associates with a member in good standing of the bar of this court as local counsel.' Local counsel must sign and file all documents, and must be present in court during all proceedings unless otherwise ordered. The court's local rules are available on the district court's website located at www.sdd.uscourts.gov.To apply for admission PHV, complete the Motion for Admission PHV form found on our website under 'Local Forms' and submit it to local counsel for electronic filing. The PHV fee is $100. Local counsel may pay the fee electronically by using Pay.gov.Docket sheet mailed/emailed to non-resident attorney(s) (SLT)
October 20, 2020 Filing 90 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2041) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2043) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2136) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2234) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2713) Memorandum Opinion and Order Regarding Michael Woods, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2927) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3051) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8013) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Michael Woods, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8233) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Michael Woods)(Gage, William) (Modified on 10/21/2020 to add party filers) (mkw).[Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 89 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2649) - Memorandum Opinion and Order Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8041) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8191) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) (Modified on 10/21/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 88 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2039) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2042) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2187) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2247) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2458) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2621) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2841) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2957) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (3037) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8071) Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (8073) Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2723) - Memorandum Opinion and Order regarding Shelby Thames, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (8234) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames)(Gage, William) (Modified on 10/21/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 87 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2003) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2004) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2175) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2240) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2469) Pls Amended Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2470) Pls Amended Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2618) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2728) - Memorandum Opinion and Order Regarding Salil Khandwala, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2925) Defs Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8033) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Salil Khandwala, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8201) Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp Regarding Salil Khandwala)(Gage, William) (Modified on 10/21/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 86 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2015) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Stephen Factor, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2020) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Stephen Factor, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2135) Part 1 Defs Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Stephen Factor, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2135) Part 2 Defs Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Stephen Factor, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2256) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Stephen Factor, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2670) Memorandum Opinion and Order Regarding Stephen Factor, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7975) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot of Stephen Factor, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8202) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp Regarding Stephen Factor)(Gage, William) (Modified on 10/21/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 85 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (6876) Pls Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (6877) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (7020) Part 1 Defs' Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (7020) Part 2 Defs' Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (7970) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8225) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude C. Bryce Bowling)(Gage, William) (Modified on 10/21/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 84 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2115) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2116) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2201) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2264) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8045) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8162) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Brian Raybon)(Gage, William) (Modified on 10/21/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 83 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2079) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2080) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2148) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2229) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3019) Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3592) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3594) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3788) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3845) Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8018) Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (8155) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian)(Gage, William) (Modified on 10/21/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 82 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1977) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1977) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1977) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1981) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2100) - Defs' Mot to Substitute Amended Exhibit A to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2164) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2210) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (4574) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (4675) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (4675) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (4692) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (7980) Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8142) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher)(Gage, William) (Modified on 10/21/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 81 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #80 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2128) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Alan Garely, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2128) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Alan Garely, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2129) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Alan Garely, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2202) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Alan Garely, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2286) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Alan Garely, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8040) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Alan Garely, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8139) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Alan Garely)(Gage, William) (Modified on 10/21/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 80 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (240) Master Answer of Ethicon LLC to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 10/21/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 10/27/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/26/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/13/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 78 REPLY by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis to #77 Response In Opposition. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 77 RESPONSE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in opposition to #76 MOTION by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis or Leave to File Supplemental Response in opposition to Defendants' #67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
June 20, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis for Leave to File Supplemental Response in opposition to Defendants' #67 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Garrard, Henry) (Modified on 6/20/2019 to add link to #67 motion) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 75 RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis, re: #73 Amended Notice of Deposition of Dr. Alan Garely. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 74 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to #69 Response In Opposition. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 73 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Alan Garely, M.D. on 7/19/2019 at 1:00 p.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 72 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to #70 Response In Opposition. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis for Supplemental Expert Report of Alan D. Garely. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 70 RESPONSE by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis in opposition to #68 Memorandum In Support, #67 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 69 RESPONSE by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis in opposition to #66 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Exclude CERTAIN CASE-SPECIFIC OPINIONS OF ALAN GARELY, M.D. AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson in support of #67 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson to Exclude CERTAIN CASE-SPECIFIC OPINIONS OF ALAN GARELY, M.D. AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis of Dr. Cynthia Davis on May 8, 2019 at 9:00 a.m.(CST) (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 64 CROSS NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Matthew Barker on May 8, 2019 at 2:00 pm. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Subpoena, #2 Appendix Schedule A, #3 Appendix Deposition Protocol)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Cynthia Davis on May 8, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Subpoena, #2 Appendix Deposition Protocol, #3 Appendix Schedule A)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 62 STIPULATION by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) (Modified on 4/19/2019 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 61 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis of Dr. Christopher Klingele on May 15, 2019 at 1:00 p.m.(CST) (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis of Dr. Christopher Klingele on May 15, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis of Dr. Matthew Barker on May 8, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 58 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES REGARDING DEPOSITIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FRIENDS AND FAMILY MEMBERS by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis, Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Modak-Truran, Anita) (Modified on 4/9/2019 to add party filers) (mkw).[Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Alan Garely, M.D. on 4/12/19 at 8:00 a.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 55 AMENDED CROSS NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis of Dr. Kevin D. Benson on May 5, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David Michael Cohen on behalf of Johnson & Johnson, Ethicon, Inc. (Cohen, David) (Modified on 3/18/2019 to add party filer) (lca). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Bernd Klosterhalfen on April 26, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 52 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Kevin D. Benson on 5/9/2019 at 2:00 PM (Attachments: #1 Appendix Subpoena, #2 Appendix Deposition Protocol)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 51 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 3/8/2019, re: IME, Court Reporter: Lisa Cook. (hkl) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis for Rule 26 Expert Report of Prof. Dr. Med Bernd Klosterhalfen, M.D. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis for Rule 26 Expert Report of Alan D. Garley, M.D.. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis for Designation and Disclosure of Expert Witnesses. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 47 CROSS NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis of Dr. Kevin D. Benson on February 20, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis for Responses to Second Requests for Admission. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis for Responses to Second Request for Production of Documents. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis for Responses to Second Interrogatories. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson for Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admissions. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis for Responses to Request for Production of Documents. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis for Responses to Request for Admissions. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis for Responses to Interrogatories. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for Second Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Modak-Truran, Anita)(Modified on 12/26/2018 to remove party filer)(rmc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Kevin D. Benson on 02/20/2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Attachments: #1 PTO #38, #2 Subpoena)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis for Plaintiffs' First Set of Request for Production of Documents to Defendants. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis for Plaintiffs' First Request for Admissions to Defendants. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis for Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
December 19, 2018 Filing 34 RESPONSE AND OBJECTIONS by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis to #32 Notice of Deposition by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Kristen Sluis (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christopher D. Morris on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson. (Morris, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Kristen Sluis on 1/31/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and Greg Sluis on 1/31/2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena to Kristen Sluis, #2 Subpoena to Greg Sluis)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Anita Modak-Truran on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Morris, Christopher) (Modified on 12/6/2018 to remove party filers)(rmc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 29 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Greg Sluis, Kristen Lee Sluis. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PRETRIAL ORDER # 320 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 10 Cases) The cases on Exhibits A are: 1.) removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2.) placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1.) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2.) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3.) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and 4.) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 10 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 10 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 11/15/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due 11/22/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due 12/21/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 02/22/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 03/22/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 03/29/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 04/29/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 05/13/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 06/03/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 05/13/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 06/03/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3.) Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 03/25/2019, and any response is due by 04/09/2019. Any reply is due by 04/15/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Civil Rule 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1.) Venue Recommendations. By no later than 04/06/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 04/13/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/31/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 10 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (brn) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (brn) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 3/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/19/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the Plaintiff(s) and Defendants have reached a settlement. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and Defendants may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 9/01/2017; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 3072 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/16/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Based on representation of counsel that Laura H. Dixon no longer represents any party in this MDL or any party in any member case, the above named counsel is terminated where she appears as counsel for any party in this MDL and in any member case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/5/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (all) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
January 31, 2013 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
January 31, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Dixon on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Dixon, Laura) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
January 29, 2013 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
January 29, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
January 22, 2013 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, LLC. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 26, 2012 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Ethicon, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Ethicon, LLC served on 11/9/2012, answer due 11/30/2012. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 2, 2012 Filing 14 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Kristen Lee Sluis and Greg Sluis for Ethicon, LLC, re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies for the defendant mailed to Henry G. Garrard for service. (jws) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
November 1, 2012 Filing 13 SUMMONS TO BE REISSUED SUBMITTED by Kristen Lee Sluis, Greg Sluis for Ethicon, LLC, re: #1 Short Form Complaint. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 17, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Susan M. Robinson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 17, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Philip J. Combs on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 17, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
October 2, 2012 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY PERSONAL SERVICE for Ethicon, Inc. re: #1 Complaint. Ethicon, Inc. served on 9/14/2012, answer due 10/5/2012. Person Served: Linda Banks, Person Designated to Accept Service (Garrard, Henry) Modified on 10/16/2012 to add text for clarity (arb). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
September 19, 2012 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Johnson & Johnson served on 9/13/2012, answer due 10/4/2012. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
September 11, 2012 Filing 7 SUMMONS REISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Kristen Lee Sluis and Greg Sluis for Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, and Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies for each defendant mailed to Henry G. Garrard for service. (rea) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
September 7, 2012 Filing 5 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Kristen Lee Sluis, Greg Sluis for Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
September 7, 2012 Filing 4 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Kristen Lee Sluis, Greg Sluis for Ethicon, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
September 7, 2012 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Kristen Lee Sluis, Greg Sluis for Ethicon, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. (Garrard, Henry) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
September 4, 2012 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Kristen Lee Sluis and Greg Sluis for Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, and Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies of each mailed to Henry Garrard for service. (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
September 4, 2012 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER 14 (Amended Master Complaint and Master Responsive Pleadings; Direct Filing) entered on 08/31/2012 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Master Long Form Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Master Answer and Jury Demand to First Amended Master Complaint) (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]
August 31, 2012 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-1972555. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sluis et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Sluis
Represented By: James B. Matthews, III
Represented By: Alexandra K. Hughes
Represented By: Josh B. Wages
Represented By: Sara Schramm
Represented By: Thomas F. Hollingsworth
Represented By: Mark W. Haigh
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Lee Sluis
Represented By: James B. Matthews, III
Represented By: Alexandra K. Hughes
Represented By: Josh B. Wages
Represented By: Sara Schramm
Represented By: Thomas F. Hollingsworth
Represented By: Mark W. Haigh
Represented By: Henry G. Garrard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Katelyn A. Cook
Represented By: Daniel E. Ashmore
Represented By: Pamela L. Ferrell
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, LLC
Represented By: Katelyn A. Cook
Represented By: Daniel E. Ashmore
Represented By: Pamela L. Ferrell
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Katelyn A. Cook
Represented By: Daniel E. Ashmore
Represented By: Pamela L. Ferrell
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?