Peters v. Bowling Green Inn of South Dakota
Plaintiff: Brian Peters
Defendant: Bowling Green Inn of South Dakota, Inc. doing business as Keystone Treatment Center
Case Number: 4:2020cv04180
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 25 FORM 52 REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting by Bowling Green Inn of South Dakota, Inc..(Haigh, Mark)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Dan Rasmus for Brian Peters. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 12/17/2020. (LH)
December 4, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Attorney Dan Rasmus to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-3439454) by Brian Peters. (Trzynka, Robert)
December 4, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Trzynka on behalf of Brian Peters. (Trzynka, Robert)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 12/03/2020. (LH)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction in Minnesota due to transfer to the District of South Dakota. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/30/20. (Lange, Roberto)
November 23, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bowling Green Inn of South Dakota, Inc.. (Haigh, Mark)
November 20, 2020 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:20-cv-01973. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 11/20/2020. Sent unrestricted DE to Daniel Rasmus via Email at drasmus@hovlandrasmus.com (SKK).
November 20, 2020 CLERK'S TEXT LETTER TO NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY(S) Local Rule 83.2 (E) allows attorneys to appear pro hac vice (PHV) if they associate with local counsel. The rule provides, in relevant part, that '[a]n attorney who is not a member of the bar of this court, but who is a member in good standing of the bar of another United States District Court, may, upon motion and approval by the court, participate in the conduct of a particular case, but such motion may be allowed only if the applicant associates with a member in good standing of the bar of this court as local counsel.' Local counsel must sign and file all documents, and must be present in court during all proceedings unless otherwise ordered. The court's local rules are available on the district court's website located at www.sdd.uscourts.gov.To apply for admission PHV, complete the Motion for Admission PHV form found on our website under 'Local Forms' and submit it to local counsel for electronic filing. The PHV fee is $100. Local counsel may pay the fee electronically by using Pay.gov.Docket sheet mailed/emailed to non-resident attorney(s). Sent to Daniel R. Rasmus via Email at drasmus@hovlandrasmus.com (SKK)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Stipulation to Transfer, ECF No. #15 . Signed by Judge David S. Doty on 11/16/2020.(LGC) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/20/2020.]
November 12, 2020 Filing 16 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #15 Stipulation,. (Haigh, Mark) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/20/2020.]
November 12, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Bowling Green Inn of South Dakota, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Brian Peters, as Trustee for the Next of Kin of Tyler Peters, Decedent. (Haigh, Mark) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/20/2020.]
November 12, 2020 Filing 14 (Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2020 at 02:00 PM in Judge's Chambers 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty is hereby stricken from the calendar. (DLO) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/20/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 9/25/2020.(DLO) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/20/2020.]
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2020 at 02:00 PM in Judge's Chambers 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Haigh, Mark) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/20/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bowling Green Inn of South Dakota, Inc..(Haigh, Mark) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/20/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Bowling Green Inn of South Dakota, Inc.. (Haigh, Mark) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/20/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Bowling Green Inn of South Dakota, Inc. re #5 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. (Haigh, Mark) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/20/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #4 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bowling Green Inn of South Dakota, Inc..(Haigh, Mark) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/20/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Aimee Scholten in SUPPORT OF #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bowling Green Inn of South Dakota, Inc..(Haigh, Mark) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/20/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of John Stamp in SUPPORT OF #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bowling Green Inn of South Dakota, Inc..(Haigh, Mark) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/20/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bowling Green Inn of South Dakota, Inc..(Haigh, Mark) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/20/2020.]
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bowling Green Inn of South Dakota, Inc.. (Haigh, Mark) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/20/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 3 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Ryan W.W. Redd as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/20/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 20-cv-1973 DSD/ECW. (CLK) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/20/2020.]
September 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-8060728) filed by Bowling Green Inn of South Dakota d/b/a Keystone Treatment Center. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Haigh, Mark) [Transferred from Minnesota on 11/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peters v. Bowling Green Inn of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Peters
Represented By: R Daniel Rasmus
Represented By: R. Daniel Rasmus
Represented By: Robert D. Trzynka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowling Green Inn of South Dakota, Inc. doing business as Keystone Treatment Center
Represented By: Mark W. Haigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?