Tieszen v. EBay, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ryan Tieszen
Defendant: Vapah, Inc., LG Chem America, Inc., LG Chem Ltd., EBay, Inc. and First Doe through Thirtieth Doe
Case Number: 4:2021cv04002
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Ryan Tieszen. (Christman, Shad)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY to Motion Response re #14 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Motion #14 filed by LG Chem America, Inc.. (Landon, Stephen)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED ANSWER to COMPLAINT by Vapah, Inc.. (Shattuck, Timothy)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Shad E. Christman on behalf of Ryan Tieszen. (Christman, Shad)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Filing Error: #23 Notice of Appearance was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Siegel, Steven)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven S. Siegel on behalf of Ryan Tieszen. (Siegel, Steven) Modified text on 2/4/2021 (JLS).
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER for Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on February 2, 2021. (DLC)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Vapah, Inc.. (Shattuck, Timothy)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ryan Tieszen. (Siegel, Steven)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DECLARATION of Rebekah Long re #17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration information, #2 Exhibit 2 - eBay September 30, 2008 User Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - eBay August 2012 update to User Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - eBay August 21, 2012 User Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - eBay September 29, 2016 User Agreement) (Oberg, Steven)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by EBay, Inc.. (Oberg, Steven)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by EBay, Inc.. (Oberg, Steven)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #14 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction DECLARATION OF HYUNSOO KIM filed by LG Chem America, Inc.. (Landon, Stephen)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by LG Chem America, Inc.. (Landon, Stephen)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by LG Chem America, Inc.. (Landon, Stephen)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by LG Chem Ltd.. (Landon, Stephen) Modified on 1/12/2021 (JLS).
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Filing Error: #13 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Landon, Stephen)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Vapah, Inc.. (Shattuck, Timothy)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by EBay, Inc. . (Oberg, Steven)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Vapah, Inc. . (Shattuck, Timothy)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 (FILED IN ERROR) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by EBay, Inc.. (Oberg, Steven) Modified text on 1/8/2021 (JLS).
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by EBay, Inc.. (Oberg, Steven)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Filing Error: #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Oberg, Steven)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Oberg on behalf of EBay, Inc.. (Oberg, Steven)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT to REMOVAL signed by Defendant Vapah, Inc. . (Shattuck, Timothy)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth A. Lopour on behalf of Vapah, Inc.. (Lopour, Seth)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy R. Shattuck on behalf of Vapah, Inc.. (Shattuck, Timothy)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONSENT to Removal signed by Defendant EBay, Inc. . (Oberg, Steven)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Rule 73 Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 85)(DLC)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LG Chem America, Inc. from Second Judicial Circuit, case number 49CIV20-003309. ($402.00 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3456017) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tieszen v. EBay, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Tieszen
Represented By: Steven S. Siegel
Represented By: Shad E. Christman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vapah, Inc.
Represented By: Seth A. Lopour
Represented By: Timothy R. Shattuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen C. Landon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Chem Ltd.
Represented By: Stephen C. Landon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBay, Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Oberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Doe through Thirtieth Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?