Franzky v. South Dakota Human Services Center
Plaintiff: Collin Peter Franzky
Defendant: South Dakota Human Services Center
Case Number: 4:2021cv04013
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Collin Peter Franzky. (SLW)
March 22, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Collin Peter Franzky. (SLW)
March 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Extend by Collin Peter Franzky. (SLW)
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction AMENDED filed by South Dakota Human Services Center. (Bell, Justin)
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by South Dakota Human Services Center. (Bell, Justin)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to DISMISS for Lack of Jurisdiction by South Dakota Human Services Center. (Bell, Justin)
March 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert B. Anderson on behalf of South Dakota Human Services Center. (Anderson, Robert)
March 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin L. Bell on behalf of South Dakota Human Services Center. (Bell, Justin)
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed South Dakota Human Services Center served on 2/11/2021, answer due 3/4/2021. (SLW)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to South Dakota Human Services Center. A Rule 73 Memo, reissued summons and AO 85 delivered to Plaintiff via USPS. (MSB)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to South Dakota Human Services Center. 1 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, a copy of Fed.R.Civ.P.4, and AO 85 delivered to Plaintiff via USPS. (Attachments: #1 South Dakota Human Services Center Summons, #2 AO85)(MSB)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Complaint together with the filing fee and incorrectly completed summons(es) or no summons(es). A new case has been opened. We are unable to issue summon(es) at this time. Enclosed is a AO85, Rule 73 Memo, blank summons form and a sample completed summons form. Follow the enclosed instructions to properly complete your summons(es). As soon as the Clerks Office receives your properly completed summons(es), it/they will be issued. Copy of docket sheet, blank summons form, and sample completed summons form with instructions sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franzky v. South Dakota Human Services Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Dakota Human Services Center
Represented By: Robert B. Anderson
Represented By: Justin L. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Collin Peter Franzky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?