Teague v. The State of South Dakota et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Ellis Teague, Jr.
Defendant: Elhers, Tashara Lynn Anderson and State of South Dakota
Case Number: 4:2021cv04031
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 TRANSMITTAL of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re #19 Mail Returned and Notice of updated address for Mr. Teague.. (DLC)
April 23, 2021 Filing 19 Mail sent to Ramond Ellis Teague, Jr. was returned as undeliverable. #15 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis was returned. (Per phone conversation with Minnehaha County Jail and the Shawnee County Jail in Topeka KS was able to confirm Mr. Teague is at the Shawnee County Jail as of today's date, updated his address on the docket sheet and remailed Doc. 15 to him at that address) (DLC)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER of USCA directing Clerk of the District Court to forward portions of the original record not available in an electronic format through PACER to USCA within 10 days re #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Raymond Ellis Teague, Jr... (TAL)
April 19, 2021 Filing 17 USCA Case Number for #12 Notice of Appeal filed by Raymond Ellis Teague, Jr.. USCA Case Number: 21-1863. (TAL)
April 16, 2021 Filing 16 TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re #12 Notice of Appeal. (SAC)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on appeal. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 04/16/2021. MAILED to Mr. Teague and Minnehaha County Jail financial unit. (SAC)
April 15, 2021 Filing 14 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SAC)
April 15, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appeal Without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration by Raymond Ellis Teague, Jr. (SAC) (Main Document 13 replaced on 4/15/2021 to delete extra page) (SAC).
April 15, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #8 Judgment by Raymond Ellis Teague, Jr.. (SAC)
April 2, 2021 Filing 11 MISCELLANEOUS SUBMISSION by Plaintiff Raymond Ellis Teague, Jr (SAC)
April 2, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER Received from Raymond Teague Jr.. (SAC)
March 31, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER Received from Raymond Teague Jr.. (SAC)
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 JUDGMENT Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 03/30/2021. MAILED to Mr. Teague along with Prisoner Appeal Packet on 03/31/2021. (SAC)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and 1915A Screening for Dismissal. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 03/30/2021. MAILING to Mr. Teague and Minnehaha Jail Financial Unit. (SAC)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER Received from Raymond E. Teague Jr. to Judge Schreier. (Attachments: #1 Attachment (best possible scan)) (SAC)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SAC)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raymond Ellis Teague, Jr. (SAC)
March 15, 2021 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Raymond Ellis Teague, Jr. (SAC)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint. Although a new case has been opened, your case cannot proceed further until you either pay the filing fee OR complete and return the enclosed Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury AND Prisoner Trust Account Report (to be completed by the institution where you are incarcerated). Copy of docket sheet, Application to Proceed IFP, and Prisoner Trust Account Report sent to plaintiff. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (SAC)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Raymond Ellis Teague Jr. (SAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teague v. The State of South Dakota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elhers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tashara Lynn Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of South Dakota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Ellis Teague, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?