Brunet v. Progressive Northern Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Scott Daniel Brunet
Defendant: Progressive Northern Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv04058
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 05/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Letter)(MSB)
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Progressive Northern Insurance Company. (Arndt, Mark)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Arndt on behalf of Progressive Northern Insurance Company. (Arndt, Mark)
April 16, 2021 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued Acknowledgement filed by Scott Daniel Brunet. (Preheim, Eric)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Progressive Northern Insurance Company. 1 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(SLW)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3516943, in shell case on 4/8/21 filed by Scott Daniel Brunet on 4/8/21. (SLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brunet v. Progressive Northern Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark J. Arndt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Daniel Brunet
Represented By: Derek A. Nelsen
Represented By: Eric T. Preheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?