CCC Information Services INC. v. First Rate Excavate, Inc et al
Plaintiff: CCC Information Services INC.
Defendant: Split Rock Landscaping & Nursery, Inc, Confluence, Inc, First Rate Excavate, Inc and Dakota Contracting Corporation
Case Number: 4:2021cv04068
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Filing 29 FORM 52 REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting by CCC Information Services INC..(Juarez, Cesar)
June 1, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER to #24 Crossclaim by First Rate Excavate, Inc. (Deinert, Ryland) Modified to clarify text on 6/1/2021 (SLW).
May 26, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to #19 Crossclaim by Confluence, Inc. (Wheeler, Gregory) Modified on 5/26/2021 (SST). Modified to clarify text on 5/27/2021 (SLW).
May 24, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to #20 Crossclaim of First Rate Excavate, Inc. by Dakota Contracting Corporation. (Hertz, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/24/2021 to add document link (SKK). Modified to clarify text on 5/25/2021 (SLW).
May 24, 2021 Filing 25 ANSWER to #23 Crossclaim, of Split Rock Landscaping & Nursery, Inc., by Dakota Contracting Corporation. (Hertz, Elizabeth) Modified to clarify text on 5/25/2021 (SLW).
May 20, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #19 Crossclaim, CROSSCLAIM against First Rate Excavate, Inc by Split Rock Landscaping & Nursery, Inc. (Linde, Paul) Modified to clarify text on 5/20/2021 (SLW).
May 20, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER to #16 Crossclaim, CROSSCLAIM against Dakota Contracting Corporation by Split Rock Landscaping & Nursery, Inc. (Linde, Paul) Modified to clarify text on 5/20/2021 (SLW).
May 19, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #18 Crossclaim of Confluence, Inc. by Dakota Contracting Corporation. (Hertz, Elizabeth) Modified to fix link and clarify text on 5/20/2021 (SLW).
May 17, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryland L. Deinert on behalf of First Rate Excavate, Inc. (Deinert, Ryland)
May 17, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #16 Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against Dakota Contracting Corporation by First Rate Excavate, Inc. (Deinert, Ryland) Modified to clarify text on 5/18/2021 (SLW).
May 17, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Confluence, Inc, Split Rock Landscaping & Nursery, Inc by First Rate Excavate, Inc. (Deinert, Ryland)
May 11, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #16 Crossclaim , CROSSCLAIM against Dakota Contracting Corporation by Confluence, Inc. (Wheeler, Gregory) Modified to clarify text on 5/12/2021 (SLW).
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 05/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Letter)(MSB)
May 10, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Confluence, Inc, First Rate Excavate, Inc, Split Rock Landscaping & Nursery, Inc by Dakota Contracting Corporation. (Hertz, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn J. Boomsma on behalf of First Rate Excavate, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Boomsma, Glenn)
May 5, 2021 Filing 14 Separate ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Split Rock Landscaping & Nursery, Inc. (Linde, Paul)
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Confluence, Inc. (Wheeler, Gregory)
May 3, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CCC Information Services INC.. First Rate Excavate, Inc served on 4/27/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (Juarez, Cesar)
May 3, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CCC Information Services INC.. Confluence, Inc served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Juarez, Cesar)
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CCC Information Services INC.. Dakota Contracting Corporation served on 4/19/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Juarez, Cesar)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CCC Information Services INC.. Split Rock Landscaping & Nursery, Inc served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Juarez, Cesar)
April 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth S. Hertz on behalf of Dakota Contracting Corporation. (Hertz, Elizabeth)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 Filed in error: NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth S. Hertz on behalf of Dakota Contracting Corporation. (Hertz, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/27/2021 (SLW).
April 26, 2021 NOTICE of Filing Error: #7 Notice of Appearance was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Hertz, Elizabeth)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jonathan L. Baker for CCC Information Services INC.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 04/19/2021. (MSB)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Timothy B. Hardwicke for CCC Information Services INC.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 04/19/2021. (MSB)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Jonathan L. Baker to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3525223) by CCC Information Services INC.. (Juarez, Cesar)
April 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney Timothy B. Hardwicke to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3525208) by CCC Information Services INC.. (Juarez, Cesar)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Confluence, Inc, Dakota Contracting Corporation, First Rate Excavate, Inc, Split Rock Landscaping & Nursery, Inc. 4 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO85)(MSB)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3524757, in shell case on 04/16/2021 filed by CCC Information Services INC. on 04/16/2021. (MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CCC Information Services INC. v. First Rate Excavate, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Split Rock Landscaping & Nursery, Inc
Represented By: Paul H. Linde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Confluence, Inc
Represented By: Gregory H. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Rate Excavate, Inc
Represented By: Glenn J. Boomsma
Represented By: Ryland L. Deinert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota Contracting Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Hertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CCC Information Services INC.
Represented By: Cesar A. Juarez
Represented By: Timothy B. Hardwicke
Represented By: Jonathan L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?