Willison v. Smithfield Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Willison
Defendant: Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp., Any and all Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants, John Morrell & Co. and Smithfield Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv04083
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 07/01/2021. Sent to Mr. James A. Karamanis via USPS on 07/01/2021. (MSB)
June 11, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Any and all Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp.. (Tobin, Michael)
May 24, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Tobin on behalf of All Defendants. (Tobin, Michael)
May 6, 2021 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:20-cv-07631. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 6, 2021 Filing 15 TRANSFERRED to the USDC District of South Dakota the electronic record. (sxb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/6/2021.]
May 6, 2021 CLERK'S TEXT LETTER TO NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY(S) Local Rule 83.2 (E) allows attorneys to appear pro hac vice (PHV) if they associate with local counsel. The rule provides, in relevant part, that '[a]n attorney who is not a member of the bar of this court, but who is a member in good standing of the bar of another United States District Court, may, upon motion and approval by the court, participate in the conduct of a particular case, but such motion may be allowed only if the applicant associates with a member in good standing of the bar of this court as local counsel.' Local counsel must sign and file all documents, and must be present in court during all proceedings unless otherwise ordered. The court's local rules are available on the district court's website located at www.sdd.uscourts.gov.To apply for admission PHV, complete the Motion for Admission PHV form found on our website under 'Local Forms' and submit it to local counsel for electronic filing. The PHV fee is $100. Local counsel may pay the fee electronically by using Pay.gov.Docket sheet mailed/emailed to non-resident attorney(s) (SLW)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court grants Defendants Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. and Smithfield Foods, Inc.'s motion to transfer venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 #8 . The Court transfers this case to the U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota. See Statement. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 4/22/2021. Mailed notice. (sxb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/6/2021.]
April 22, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis:Telephone conference held on 4/22/2021. Enter Order transferring this case to the U.S. District Court for the District of South Dakota. [For further details see separate order]. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (rj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/6/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 STATUS Report Defendant's Initial Status Report by Smithfield Foods, Inc., Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. (Payne, Ronald) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/6/2021.]
March 19, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY by Defendants Smithfield Foods, Inc., Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. to terminate deadlines and hearings,,,,,, set/reset hearings,,,,,, set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings,,,,, #10 Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue (Payne, Ronald) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/6/2021.]
February 26, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Defendant's motion to transfer venue #8 : Plaintiff's response is due by 3/12/2021 and Defendant's reply is due by 3/19/2021. The Court strikes the status date set for 3/9/2021 and resets it to 4/22/2021 at 1:30 p.m., with an initial status report due by 4/15/2021. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/6/2021.]
February 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Ronald W. Payne for presentment of motion to transfer case, #8 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 3/9/2021 at 09:45 AM. (Payne, Ronald) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/6/2021.]
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants Smithfield Foods, Inc., Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. to transfer case Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ronald Payne, Esq. in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404)(Payne, Ronald) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/6/2021.]
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Defendants' motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #6 . Defendants' responsive pleading is due by 3/3/2021. The Court reminds the parties that they must notice their motions for presentment according to the Court's standing orders. The Court strikes the status date set for 2/24/2021 and resets it to 3/9/2021 at 9:30 a.m., with a joint status report due by 3/4/2021. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/6/2021.]
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION by Defendant Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. for extension of time to file answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (Payne, Ronald) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/6/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Willison as to Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. on 1/13/2021, answer due 2/3/2021. served on Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. on 01/13/2021 (Karamanis, James) Modified on 1/19/2021 (bg, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/6/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Willison as to Smithfield Foods, Inc. on 1/13/2021, answer due 2/3/2021. served on Smithfield Foods, Inc. on 01/13/2021 (Karamanis, James) (Docket text modifid by Clerk's Office) Modified on 1/19/2021 (bg, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/6/2021.]
January 12, 2021 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Smithfield Foods, Inc., Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp. (txl, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/6/2021.]
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial telephonic status conference in this matter is set for 2/24/2021 at 9:30 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 2/17/2021. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/6/2021.]
December 22, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/6/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Karamanis, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/6/2021.]
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Robert Willison; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17766921.(Karamanis, James) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 5/6/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willison v. Smithfield Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smithfield Packaged Meats Corp.
Represented By: Michael F. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Any and all Unknown Owners and Non-Record Claimants
Represented By: Michael F. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Morrell & Co.
Represented By: Michael F. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smithfield Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Michael F. Tobin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Willison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?