The Employee Benefits Administration Committee v. AlaskaCare Retiree Health Plan
Plaintiff: The Employee Benefits Administration Committee for and on Behalf of the Northwestern Energy Flexible Componsation Plan and Its Component Plan the Health Benefit Plan for All Active Employees of NorthW doing business as Northwestern Energy and The Employee Benefits Administration Committee For and On Behalf of Northwestern Energy Flexible Compensation Plan and Its Component Plan the Health Benefit Plan for All Active Employees of Northwestern Corporation doing business as NorthWestern Ener
Defendant: AlaskaCare Retiree Health Plan
Case Number: 4:2021cv04119
Filed: July 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (E.R.I.S.A.)
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. AlaskaCare Retiree Health Plan answer due 9/28/2021.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 09/03/2021. (VMM)
September 3, 2021 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by AlaskaCare Retiree Health Plan. (Duncan, Dennis)
August 17, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by AlaskaCare Retiree Health Plan . (Duncan, Dennis)
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 STIPULATION re extension of time to answer by AlaskaCare Retiree Health Plan. (Duncan, Dennis)
August 17, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis L. Duncan on behalf of AlaskaCare Retiree Health Plan. (Duncan, Dennis)
August 2, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant AlaskaCare Retiree Health Plan on July 26, 2021 (Schulte, Eric)
August 2, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant AlaskaCare Retiree Health Plan on July 19, 2021 (Schulte, Eric)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Melanie M. Lazor for The Employee Benefits Administration Committee; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian J. Lamb for The Employee Benefits Administration Committee. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 07/19/2021. (VMM)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Brian J. Lamb to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3587923) by The Employee Benefits Administration Committee. (Schulte, Eric)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Melanie M. Lazor to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3587921) by The Employee Benefits Administration Committee. (Schulte, Eric)
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by The Employee Benefits Administration Committee. (Schulte, Eric)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Re-Issued as to AlaskaCare Retiree Health Plan. 1 Summons delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (SAC)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by The Employee Benefits Administration Committee. (Schulte, Eric)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AlaskaCare Retiree Health Plan. 1 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Issued Summons, #2 AO85)(MSB)
July 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3583748, in shell case on 07/12/2021 filed by The Employee Benefits Administration Committee for and on Behalf of the Northwestern Energy Flexible Componsation Plan on 07/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - NorthWestern Energy Plan Document, #2 Exhibit B - AlaskaCare Retiree Insurance Booklet) (MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Employee Benefits Administration Committee v. AlaskaCare Retiree Health Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Employee Benefits Administration Committee for and on Behalf of the Northwestern Energy Flexible Componsation Plan and Its Component Plan the Health Benefit Plan for All Active Employees of NorthW doing business as Northwestern Energy
Represented By: Eric C. Schulte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Employee Benefits Administration Committee For and On Behalf of Northwestern Energy Flexible Compensation Plan and Its Component Plan the Health Benefit Plan for All Active Employees of Northwestern Corporation doing business as NorthWestern Ener
Represented By: Eric C. Schulte
Represented By: Brian J. Lamb
Represented By: Melanie M. Lazor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AlaskaCare Retiree Health Plan
Represented By: Dennis L. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?