Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company v. Schmidt et al
Plaintiff: Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Mary Schmidt, David Fransen, Patrick Fransen, Shirley Rush, Gerald Fransen, Jean Oberfoell and Kathy Heier
Case Number: 4:2021cv04128
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Parties shall meet by Wednesday October 27, 2021 and file their discovery plan within 14 days from then. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 09/10/2021. (KLE) Modified on 9/10/2021 sent to David Fransen, Gerald Fransen, Jean Oberfoell, Kathy Heier, Mary Schmidt and Patrick Fransen via USPS KLE).
September 10, 2021 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Service by Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company (Eden, Shane)
September 10, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION to Extend Deadlines to Complete Rule 26(f) Conference by Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company. (Eden, Shane)
September 10, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company . (Eden, Shane)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Mary Schmidt shall file an answer by 10/1/2021. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 09/10/2021. (KLE) Modified on 9/10/2021 sent to David Fransen, Gerald Fransen, Jean Oberfoell, Kathy Heier, Mary Schmidt and Patrick Fransen via USPS (KLE).
September 10, 2021 Filing 24 SUBPOENAS Issued for Avantara Huron Nursing Home and Rehab., Huron Clinic and Huron Regional Medical Center. (Sent to David J. Fransen via USPS) (MSB)
September 2, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Mary Schmidt. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (VMM)
September 1, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint sent from Davenport Evans Office by Jean Oberfoell. (Patrick Fransen Answer referred to in attached letter was previously docketed #19 ) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Letter from Davenport Evans) (MSB)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Gerald Fransen answer due 9/21/2021. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 08/31/2021. Mailed copy via USPS to Gerald Fransen (VMM) Mailed copy to Kathy Heier and Patrick Fransen via USPS on 9/2/2021 (VMM)
August 30, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Gerald Fransen. (VMM)
August 30, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Patrick Fransen. (VMM)
August 30, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Kathy Heier. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (VMM)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 8/27/21. (SKK)
August 27, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Mary Schmidt, COUNTERCLAIM against Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company by David Fransen. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Correspondence) (SKK)
August 27, 2021 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgement filed by Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company. (Eden, Shane)
August 24, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Gerald Fransen on 08/06/2021 (Eden, Shane)
August 20, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Kathy Heier on 08/10/2021 (Eden, Shane)
August 20, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant David Fransen on 08/10/2021 (Eden, Shane)
August 18, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Jean Oberfoell on 08/09/2021 (Eden, Shane)
August 16, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Mary Schmidt on 08/11/2021 (Eden, Shane)
August 16, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Patrick Fransen on 08/11/2021 (Eden, Shane)
August 16, 2021 Filing 8 Interpleader Deposit Received (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) in the amount of $31,995.88. (VMM) (VMM).
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Shirley Rush on 8/14/2021 (Eden, Shane)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Authorized deposit in the amount of $32,178.63.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 08/05/2021. (KLE) (Main Document 6 replaced on 8/5/2021) (KLE).
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Directing Plaintiff to Deposit Funds) (Eden, Shane)
August 3, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 7 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO 85)(SKK)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company. (Eden, Shane)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company. (Eden, Shane)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3593910, in shell case on 07/26/2021 filed by Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company on 07/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mary Ann duplicate policy, #2 Exhibit B - Mary Ann application, #3 Exhibit C - 5-7-2019 MA Policy Bene confirmation letter, #4 Exhibit D - Franklin duplicate policy, #5 Exhibit E - Franklin application, #6 Exhibit F - 1-14-2019 F Policy bene confirmation letter, #7 Exhibit G - Mary Ann DC, #8 Exhibit H - Franklin DC, #9 Exhibit I - Mary Claim Form MA Policy, #10 Exhibit J - Mary Claim Form F Policy, #11 Exhibit K - David's letter) (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company v. Schmidt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equitable Financial Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Shane E. Eden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Fransen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Fransen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Fransen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Oberfoell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Heier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?