Mayen v. Fluke et al
Defendant: Warden Fluke and Jason Ravensborg
Petitioner: Peter Mayen
Case Number: 4:2021cv04145
Filed: August 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
Presiding Judge: Veronica L Duffy
Referring Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus - General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 10/04/2021. (Duffy, Veronica) Sent to Petitioner via USPS on 10/4/2021 (MSB).
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to DISMISS Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Fluke, Jason Ravensborg. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Appellee's Brief, #2 Attachment Appellee's Brief, #3 Attachment Order, #4 Attachment Petition for Writ, #5 Attachment Memorandum Opinion, #6 Attachment Findings, #7 Attachment Order, #8 Attachment Judgment) (Templar, Matthew)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to DISMISS Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Response to Order to Show Cause by Fluke, Jason Ravensborg. (Templar, Matthew)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W. Templar on behalf of Fluke, Jason Ravensborg. (Templar, Matthew)
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 STATEMENT by Petitioner Peter Mayen (SAC)
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 RECEIVED Minnehaha County Cases CR11-6181 and CIV16-919; Received SD Supreme Court cases 29339 and 26575. Documents are on Clerk of Courts N Drive. (SLW)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND FOR SERVICE Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2021. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 08/18/2021. MAILING copy to Mr. Mayen and EMAILING copy of Order and doc. #1 2254 Petition to Attorney General of the State of SD via Mike Durfee 2254 service email group. (SAC)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying petitioner Peter Mayen's #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Veronica L. Duffy on 08/18/21. (Duffy, Veronica) MAILED to Mr. Mayen on 8/18/2021 (SAC).
August 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PETITIONER: The Clerks Office has received your Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 together with a Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Declaration and Prisoner Trust Account Report. A new case has been opened. Copy of docket sheet sent to petitoner. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (SAC)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Peter Mayen. (Attachments: #1 (Restricted per E-Govt Act) Confidential Application for Court-Appointed Attorney) (SAC)
August 18, 2021 Filing Fee Received from Peter Mayen. Fee Amount: $5.00, Receipt No.: #SDX400054993. (VMM)
August 17, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (SAC)
August 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Peter Mayen. (SAC)
August 17, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28:2254. (SAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayen v. Fluke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peter Mayen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Fluke
Represented By: Matthew W. Templar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Ravensborg
Represented By: Matthew W. Templar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?