Davi v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: Scott William Davi
Defendant: Darrin Young, Jessica Cook, Mary Carpenter, Troy Ponto, Angela Pechous and Doug Clark
Case Number: 4:2021cv04160
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Correct Facts in Screening by Scott William Davi. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter) (SLW)
November 3, 2021 Filing 8 Service LETTER with enclosed blank summons and USM285 forms, sample summons and USM285 forms, and blank AO85 form, along with copy of Doc. 7 sent by Clerk's Office to Plaintiff. (DJP)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 1915A SCREENING DISMISSING IN PART AND DIRECTING SERVICE IN PART. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 11/3/2021. (DJP)
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand. (VMM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2021: #1 Cover Letter) (VMM).
October 8, 2021 Filing Fee Received from Scott William Davi. Fee Amount: $350, Receipt No.: #SDX400055285. (JLS)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of 32.76 is due by 11/1/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 10/5/2021. Mailed to Plaintiff and SDSP Financial Department on 10/5/2021 (DJP)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF: The Clerks Office has received your Civil Rights Complaint together with an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees and Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury and Prisoner Trust Account Report. A new case has been opened. Any further documents or correspondence you send to the Clerks Office concerning your case must include the case number. All documents submitted for filing must also contain an original signature. Submitted documents are electronically scanned for filing and they become the official court record. The quality of the official court record is determined by the quality of the original documents received for filing. Writing should only be on one side of the paper and writing must be dark enough for scanning. All documents must be on 8.5 x 11 inch paper. A request to electronically file documents in your case must be made through the PACER Service Center at www.pacer.uscourts.gov. The plaintiff must keep the Court informed if the plaintiff's address changes. If the Court is not kept informed and multiple items are returned as undelivered, the plaintiff's case may be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (VMM)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER Trust Account Report. (VMM)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Scott William Davi. (VMM)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42:1983 - Prisoner Civil Rights with Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Cover Letter) (VMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davi v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott William Davi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrin Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Ponto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Pechous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?