Erickson et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Glynis Marie Erickson and Estate of Mark Joseph Erickson
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 4:2021cv04205
Filed: November 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2023 Filing 26 JUDGMENT Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/6/2023. (SLT)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF DISMISSAL re #24 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/6/2023. (SLT)
April 6, 2023 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to DISMISS Joint Motion for Dismissal by Ford Motor Company. (Haigh, Mark)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/6/22. (SKK)
April 6, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Protective Order Ford Motor Company's Motion for Entry of a Protective Order by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Document Protective Order) (Haigh, Mark)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Heather Fields, for Ford Motor Company; granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sandra G. Ezell for Ford Motor Company. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 03/03/2022. (SAC)
March 2, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney Sandra G. Ezell to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3738287) by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Court Admissions List) (Haigh, Mark)
March 2, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney Heather M. Fields to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3738273) by Ford Motor Company. (Haigh, Mark)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/15/2023 Motions due by 6/30/2023. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 02/23/2022. (SAC)
February 23, 2022 Filing 17 FORM 52 REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting by Ford Motor Company.(Redd, Ryan)
February 22, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan W.W. Redd on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Redd, Ryan)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 01/12/2022. (SAC)
January 12, 2022 Filing 14 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company identifying Corporate Parent Ford Motor Company, Other Affiliate China-Jiangling Motors Corporation, Limited China-Jiangling Motors Corporation, Limited, Other Affiliate Turkey-Ford Otomotiv Sanayi Anonim Sirketi (Ford Otosan) for Ford Motor Company. (Haigh, Mark)
January 12, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Haigh, Mark)
January 12, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark W. Haigh (Haigh, Mark)
January 6, 2022 NOTICE of Filing Error: #11 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Marlow, Michael)
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 Filed in error: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney by All Plaintiffs.. (Marlow, Michael) Modified on 1/7/2022 (SLW).
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James Kent Emison for Glynis Marie Erickson and Mark Joseph Erickson. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/22/2021. (SAC)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Summer L. Davidson and granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brennan B. Delaney for Glynis Marie Erickson and Mark Joseph Erickson. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/22/2021. (SAC)
December 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney James Kent Emison to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Glynis Marie Erickson, Mark Joseph Erickson. (SAC)
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney Brennan B. Delaney to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Glynis Marie Erickson, Mark Joseph Erickson. (SAC)
December 22, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Summer L. Davidson to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Glynis Marie Erickson, Mark Joseph Erickson. (SAC)
December 22, 2021 PHV Filing Fee Received from Glynis Marie Erickson, Mark Joseph Erickson. Fee Amount: $300.00, Receipt No.: #SDX400055694. (SAC)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Ford Motor Company Notice of Unopposed Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. (Haigh, Mark)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark W. Haigh on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Haigh, Mark)
December 17, 2021 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Glynis Marie Erickson served on CT Corporation System, RA for Ford Motor Company. (Marlow, Michael)
November 24, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. 1 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 AO 85 Form)(SAC)
November 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# SDX400055549,. (SAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erickson et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glynis Marie Erickson
Represented By: Michael F. Marlow
Represented By: Brennan B. Delaney
Represented By: Summer L. Davidson
Represented By: James Kent Emison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Mark Joseph Erickson
Represented By: Michael F. Marlow
Represented By: Brennan B. Delaney
Represented By: Summer L. Davidson
Represented By: James Kent Emison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Mark W. Haigh
Represented By: Heather Fields
Represented By: Sandra G. Ezell
Represented By: Ryan W.W. Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?