MetaBank, National Association, v. Munus LLC et al
Plaintiff: MetaBank National Association
Defendant: Munus LLC and Whapps LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv04022
Filed: February 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Extend. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 04/08/2022. (MSB)
April 8, 2022 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Extend For Briefing Extension by MetaBank National Association. (Snyder, Michael)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Plaintiff may serve and file a response by 4/11/2022. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 04/05/2022. (VMM)
April 5, 2022 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines for Briefing Extension by MetaBank National Association. (Snyder, Michael)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Extend. Plaintiff shall file a response by April 6, 2022. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 03/22/2022. (VMM)
March 22, 2022 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Extend re #3 MOTION to DISMISS or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue for Briefing Extension by MetaBank National Association. (Snyder, Michael)
March 22, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Snyder on behalf of MetaBank National Association. (Snyder, Michael)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Extend. Plaintiff shall file a response by Wednesday, March 23, 2022. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 03/15/2022. (VMM)
March 15, 2022 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Extend re #3 MOTION to DISMISS or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue For Briefing Extension by MetaBank National Association. (Peterson, Mitchell)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Extend. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 03/08/2022. (VMM)
March 7, 2022 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Extend re #3 MOTION to DISMISS or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue For Briefing Extension by MetaBank National Association. (Peterson, Mitchell)
February 28, 2022 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Mitchell Peterson . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service-Munus, LLC, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service-WHAPPS, LLC) (Peterson, Mitchell)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Catherine A. Keith for Munus LLC and Whapps LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 2/28/2022. (JLS)
February 28, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney Catherine A. Keith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3735177) by Munus LLC, Whapps LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy)
February 24, 2022 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by MetaBank National Association. (Peterson, Mitchell)
February 23, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against MetaBank National Association by All Defendants. (Shattuck, Timothy)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Darrell W. Cook for Munus LLC, Darrell W. Cook for Whapps LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 02/16/2022. (VMM)
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to DISMISS or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Munus LLC, Whapps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Texas Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - December 27, 2021 Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit C - January 6, 2022 Demand Letter from MUNUS, #4 Exhibit D - Texas First Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Waiver of Service) (Shattuck, Timothy)
February 16, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Darrell Cook to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3728879) by Munus LLC, Whapps LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy)
February 16, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to DISMISS or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue by Munus LLC, Whapps LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy)
February 16, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of AO 85. (Attachments: #1 AO 85) Hand delivered to counsel via SF Clerk's Office.(VMM)
February 16, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from State of South Dakota County of Lincoln Second Judicial Circuit, case number 41CIV22-000044. ($402 fee paid, receipt# SDX400055930) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lincoln County Summons and Complaint)(VMM) Modified to add receipt number on 2/16/2022 (VMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MetaBank, National Association, v. Munus LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MetaBank National Association
Represented By: Mitchell A. Peterson
Represented By: Michael L. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Munus LLC
Represented By: Timothy R. Shattuck
Represented By: Catherine A. Keith
Represented By: Darrell W. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whapps LLC
Represented By: Timothy R. Shattuck
Represented By: Catherine A. Keith
Represented By: Darrell W. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?