Hayden v. Newrez LLC et al
Plaintiff: Carmen Hayden
Defendant: Newrez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC and TransUnion, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv04043
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Trzynka, Robert)
May 10, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carmen Hayden. Newrez LLC served on 5/6/2022, answer due 5/27/2022. (Dawson, Jacob)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Enlarging Time to Answer granting #12 Motion to Extend. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 04/27/2022. (MSB)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Trevor N. Parkes for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 04/27/2022. (MSB)
April 26, 2022 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc. for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Trzynka, Robert)
April 26, 2022 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Extend by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Trzynka, Robert)
April 26, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Trevor N. Parkes to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3778408) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Trzynka, Robert)
April 26, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Trzynka on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Trzynka, Robert)
April 25, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carmen Hayden. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 4/8/2022, answer due 4/29/2022. (Dawson, Jacob)
April 20, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carmen Hayden. Equifax Information Services, LLC waiver sent on 4/4/2022, answer due 6/3/2022. (Dawson, Jacob)
April 14, 2022 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by TransUnion, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC. (Breit, Robert)
April 14, 2022 Filing 6 Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by TransUnion, LLC. (Breit, Robert)
April 14, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J Breit on behalf of TransUnion, LLC. (Breit, Robert)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph Panvini for Carmen Hayden. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 04/13/2022. (MSB)
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney Joseph Panvini to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3766059) by Carmen Hayden. (Dawson, Jacob)
March 28, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Newrez LLC, TransUnion, LLC. 4 Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85s for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Equifax Summons, #2 Experian Summons, #3 Newrez LLC Summons, #4 TransUnion Summons, #5 AO85)(MSB)
March 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402.00 fee paid, receipt #ASDDC-3754345, in shell case on 03/28/2022 filed by Carmen Hayden on 03/28/2022. (MSB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayden v. Newrez LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Hayden
Represented By: Jacob D. Dawson
Represented By: Joseph Panvini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newrez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Robert D. Trzynka
Represented By: Trevor N. Parkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Robert J Breit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?