Cengiz v. Huron Title Company et al
Plaintiff: Huseyin Cengiz
Defendant: Huron Title Company, Homestead Holdings, Inc. and Lara Hinricher
Case Number: 4:2022cv04049
Filed: April 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Discovery Report. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/4/2022. (SLT)
May 4, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Hansman, Raleigh)
April 7, 2022 Filing 8 Summons(es) Issued as to Lara Hinricher, Homestead Holdings, Inc., Huron Title Company. Summons(es), a Rule 73 Memo, and AO 85 form delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Blank AO 85 Form)(SAC)
April 7, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Huseyin Cengiz. (Kirby, Brian)
April 7, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Huseyin Cengiz. (Kirby, Brian)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Huseyin Cengiz. (Kirby, Brian)
April 7, 2022 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Huseyin Cengiz. (Kirby, Brian)
April 7, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Huseyin Cengiz. (Kirby, Brian)
April 7, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Huseyin Cengiz. (Kirby, Brian)
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3762463, in shell case on 4/6/2022 filed by Huseyin Cengiz on 4/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - July Letter) (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cengiz v. Huron Title Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huseyin Cengiz
Represented By: Brian K. Kirby
Represented By: Timothy R. Rahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huron Title Company
Represented By: Raleigh Hansman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homestead Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Raleigh Hansman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lara Hinricher
Represented By: Raleigh Hansman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?