gpac, LLP v. Mayer et al
Plaintiff: gpac, LLP
Defendant: Alexander Mayer and Green Key Resources LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv04167
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2023 Filing 31 REPLY to #6 Motion to Change Venue, Motion to Stay filed by Green Key Resources LLC, Alexander Mayer. (Goldstein, David)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/15/2024. Motions due by 3/15/2024. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/23/2023. (JLS)
January 19, 2023 Filing 29 Discovery Report Joint Discovery Report by Green Key Resources LLC, Alexander Mayer.(Goldstein, David)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Extend. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/18/2023. (JLS)
January 17, 2023 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to Extend re #6 MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Stay Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to File Their Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Transfer Venue or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Litigation by Green Key Resources LLC, Alexander Mayer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Goldstein, David)
January 11, 2023 Filing 26 AMENDED ORDER granting #24 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to File Their Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Transfer Venue or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Litigation: Defendant may serve and file a reply brief by 1/17/2023. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/10/2023. (JLS)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to File Their Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Transfer Venue or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Litigation: Defendant may serve and file a reply brief by 1/17/2023. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 1/9/2023. (JLS)
January 9, 2023 Filing 24 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendants to File Their Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion to Transfer Venue or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Litigation by Green Key Resources LLC, Alexander Mayer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Goldstein, David)
January 9, 2023 Filing 23 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by gpac, LLP. (Peterson, Mitchell)
January 5, 2023 Filing 22 REPLY to #2 Motion to Remand Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Remand to State Court filed by gpac, LLP. (Hertz, Elizabeth)
January 5, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth S. Hertz on behalf of gpac, LLP. (Hertz, Elizabeth)
January 4, 2023 Filing 20 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Green Key Resources LLC identifying Corporate Parent Green Key of Delaware LLC for Green Key Resources LLC. (Goldstein, David)
December 27, 2022 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Mitchell Peterson re #17 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue or, in the Alternative, Stay the Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 9-22-2022 email, #2 Exhibit 2 - 10-21-2022 email, #3 Exhibit 3 - 10-25-2022 email, #4 Exhibit 4 - 11-04-2022 email, #5 Exhibit 5 - 11-12-2022 email, #6 Exhibit 6 - 11-18-2022 email, #7 Exhibit 7 - 11-22-2022 email, #8 Exhibit 8 - 11-22-2022 email) (Peterson, Mitchell)
December 27, 2022 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Jason Lawrenson re #17 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue or, in the Alternative, Stay the Litigation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Employment Agreement) (Peterson, Mitchell) Modified docket text to link to 17 on 12/27/2022 (MSB).
December 27, 2022 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Stay filed by gpac, LLP. (Peterson, Mitchell)
December 23, 2022 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Jeremy D. Sosna re #14 Declaration, #15 Declaration, #13 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed in Middle District of Tennessee) (Goldstein, David)
December 23, 2022 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Alexander Mayer re #14 Declaration, #13 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion . (Goldstein, David)
December 23, 2022 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Todd Bernard re #13 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion . (Goldstein, David)
December 23, 2022 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Green Key Resources LLC, Alexander Mayer. (Goldstein, David)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/21/2022. (JLS)
December 20, 2022 Filing 11 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Green Key Resources LLC, Alexander Mayer. (Goldstein, David)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Expedite Disposition. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/8/2022. (JLS)
December 7, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Expedite Disposition filed by All Defendants. (Goldstein, David)
December 6, 2022 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Lauren E. Clements and AFFIDAVIT in Support re #6 MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Stay filed by Green Key Resources LLC, Alexander Mayer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, #2 Exhibit B - Correspondence, #3 Exhibit C - Correspondence, #4 Exhibit D - Correspondence, #5 Exhibit E - Correspondence) (Goldstein, David) Modified on 12/6/2022 to edit and add text (KLE).
December 6, 2022 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative MOTION to Stay filed by Green Key Resources LLC, Alexander Mayer. (Goldstein, David)
December 6, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Change Venue or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay by Green Key Resources LLC, Alexander Mayer. (Goldstein, David)
December 5, 2022 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Mitchell Peterson and AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION to Expedite Disposition filed by gpac, LLP. (Peterson, Mitchell) Modified on 12/5/2022 to add text (KLE).
December 5, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite Disposition by gpac, LLP. (Peterson, Mitchell)
December 5, 2022 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by gpac, LLP. (Peterson, Mitchell)
December 5, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand to State Court by gpac, LLP. (Peterson, Mitchell)
December 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Green Key Resources LLC, Alexander Mayer ($402.00 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3928445). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint and Application for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Service)(JLS)
December 2, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: gpac, LLP v. Mayer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: gpac, LLP
Represented By: Mitchell A. Peterson
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Hertz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Mayer
Represented By: David J. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Key Resources LLC
Represented By: David J. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?