Eberhardt v. Cheyenne Ridge Outfitters & Lodge, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles S. Eberhardt, II
Defendant: High Adventure Company
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Cheyenne Ridge Outfitters & Lodge, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Nikki Newton
Case Number: 4:2022cv04169
Filed: December 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/1/2024 Motions due by 2/1/2024. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 02/01/2023. (VMM)
February 1, 2023 Filing 21 Discovery Report re #20 Order for Discovery Report by Cheyenne Ridge Outfitters & Lodge, Inc.. Related document: #20 Order for Discovery Report.(Arndt, Mark)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 01/23/2023. (VMM)
January 23, 2023 Filing 19 SEPARATE ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , Joint THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Nikki Newton by Cheyenne Ridge Outfitters & Lodge, Inc.. (Arndt, Mark)
January 23, 2023 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Nikki Newton. 1 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel.. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SLW)
January 20, 2023 Filing 17 SEPARATE ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Nikki Newton by High Adventure Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Donald Prophete's Release of Liability, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) (Finer, Joshua)
January 20, 2023 Filing 16 (FILED IN ERROR) SEPARATE ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Nikki Newton by High Adventure Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Donald Prophete's Release of Liability, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) (Finer, Joshua) Modified security due to e-gov act and text on 1/23/2023 (JLS).
January 20, 2023 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by High Adventure Company. (Finer, Joshua)
January 20, 2023 NOTICE of Filing Error: #16 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint, was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Finer, Joshua)
January 19, 2023 Filing 14 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Cheyenne Ridge Outfitters & Lodge, Inc.. (Arndt, Mark)
January 13, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Arndt on behalf of Cheyenne Ridge Outfitters & Lodge, Inc.. (Arndt, Mark)
January 13, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua K. Finer on behalf of High Adventure Company. (Finer, Joshua)
January 9, 2023 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Cheyenne Ridge Outfitters & Lodge, Inc. served on 01/03/2023. (Johnson, Steven)
January 9, 2023 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by High Adventure Company. (Snyder, Michael)
January 5, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua K. Finer on behalf of Cheyenne Ridge Outfitters & Lodge, Inc., High Adventure Company. (Finer, Joshua)
January 5, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Cheyenne Ridge Outfitters & Lodge, Inc., High Adventure Company . (Finer, Joshua)
December 30, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by High Adventure Company . (Snyder, Michael)
December 30, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. Snyder on behalf of High Adventure Company. (Snyder, Michael)
December 19, 2022 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant High Adventure Company on 12/17/2022 (Johnson, Steven)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney A. Clifford Edwards for Charles S. Eberhardt, II. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/6/2022. (DJP)
December 6, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney A. Clifford Edwards to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-3930398) by Charles S. Eberhardt, II. (Johnson, Steven)
December 6, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cheyenne Ridge Outfitters & Lodge, Inc., High Adventure Company. 2 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel.. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (VMM)
December 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3930145, in shell case on 12/06/2022 filed by Charles S. Eberhardt, II on 12/06/2022. (VMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eberhardt v. Cheyenne Ridge Outfitters & Lodge, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles S. Eberhardt, II
Represented By: Ronald A. Parsons, Jr.
Represented By: Steven M. Johnson
Represented By: A. Clifford Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Cheyenne Ridge Outfitters & Lodge, Inc.
Represented By: Mark J. Arndt
Represented By: Joshua K. Finer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Adventure Company
Represented By: Joshua K. Finer
Represented By: Michael L. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Nikki Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?