Great American Insurance Company v. Mosher
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Defendant: Bradley Mosher
Case Number: 4:2023cv04022
Filed: February 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 3/27/23. (Attachments: #1 Letter to counsel)(SKK)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CITIZENSHIP Disclosure Statement by Bradley Mosher. (Heber, Jonathan) Modified text on 3/24/2023 (DJP).
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bradley Mosher. (Heber, Jonathan)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE as to Bradley Mosher served on 03/06/23. (Hustead, Patrick)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Great American Insurance Company. (Hustead, Patrick)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bradley Mosher. 1 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SKK)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-3969539, in shell case on 2/13/23 filed by Great American Insurance Company on 2/13/23. (SKK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company v. Mosher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick Q. Hustead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Mosher
Represented By: Jonathan A. Heber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?