Durfee v. GPEX Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shelby Kay Durfee
Defendant: GPEX Transport, Inc. and Amit Kumar
Case Number: 4:2023cv04042
Filed: March 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Karen E Schreier
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2023 Filing 22 Discovery Report 26(f) by GPEX Transport, Inc..(Meshbesher, Brandon)
May 8, 2023 Filing 21 I have reviewed Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure requiring nongovernmental corporate parties or nongovernmental corporations that seek to intervene to file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock and certify that it does not apply to GEPX. (Meshbesher, Brandon)
May 4, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE (Corporate Disclosure Statement not filed). D.S.D. Civ. L.R. 7.1.1 requires non-governmental organizational parties or intervenors to file either a Corporate Disclosure Statement or a Certificate that Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 is not applicable within 14 days of the party or intervenors first pleading or entry of appearance. The deadline has passed and GPEX Transport, Inc. has not complied. Said party has three business days to comply. Compliance may be achieved by docketing the statement or certificate in CM/ECF using the Corporate Disclosure Statement or Certificate of Non-Applicability event. (RRB)
May 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian A. Wood for GPEX Transport, Inc. and Amit Kumar. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 5/3/23. (SKK)
May 3, 2023 Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice by GPEX Transport, Inc., Amit Kumar re #16 MOTION for Attorney Brian Wood to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4023320) . (Meshbesher, Brandon)
May 3, 2023 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER by GPEX Transport, Inc., Amit Kumar re #16 MOTION for Attorney Brian Wood to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4023320) (Meshbesher, Brandon)
May 3, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney Brian Wood to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4023320) by GPEX Transport, Inc., Amit Kumar. (Meshbesher, Brandon)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Danny R. Ellis for Shelby Kay Durfee. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 4/24/23. (SKK)
April 24, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney Danny R. Ellis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4016303) by Shelby Kay Durfee. (Hoy, Scott)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Discovery Report Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on April 19, 2023. (DLC)
April 19, 2023 Filing 12 Clerk's DENIAL of Default as to GPEX Transport, Inc., Amit Kumar. (MWT)
April 18, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon D. Meshbesher on behalf of GPEX Transport, Inc., Amit Kumar. (Meshbesher, Brandon)
April 18, 2023 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by GPEX Transport, Inc., Amit Kumar. (Meshbesher, Brandon)
April 14, 2023 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER by Shelby Kay Durfee re #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to GPEX Transport, Inc. and Amit Kumar , #8 Affidavit in Support (Hoy, Scott)
April 14, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to GPEX Transport, Inc. and Amit Kumar by Shelby Kay Durfee. (Hoy, Scott)
April 14, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to GPEX Transport, Inc. and Amit Kumar by Shelby Kay Durfee. (Hoy, Scott)
March 28, 2023 Filing 6 ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Monae L. Johnson, South Dakota Secretary of State on 03/23/2023, filed by Shelby Kay Durfee. (Hoy, Scott)
March 28, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Sandra Rose, Process Agent on behalf of Process Agent Service Company Inc. on 03/20/2023, filed by Shelby Kay Durfee. (Hoy, Scott)
March 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by Shelby Kay Durfee Notice of Service Upon the Secretary of State. (Hoy, Scott)
March 28, 2023 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Scott G. Hoy re #1 Complaint . (Hoy, Scott)
March 21, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (ARW)
March 20, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. 2 Summons(es) delivered via hand delivery to law office staff. (ARW)
March 20, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402.00 fee paid, receipt# 400001557. (ARW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durfee v. GPEX Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Kay Durfee
Represented By: Scott G. Hoy
Represented By: Danny R. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GPEX Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon D. Meshbesher
Represented By: Brian A. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amit Kumar
Represented By: Brandon D. Meshbesher
Represented By: Brian A. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?