Mayer v. gpac, LLP
Plaintiff: Alexander Mayer
Defendant: gpac LLP
Case Number: 4:2023cv04085
Filed: May 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Office: Southern Division Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NO FURTHER DOCKETING IN THIS CASE; ALL FURTHER DOCKETING TO BE DONE IN LEAD CASE 22-4167. (CLR)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER of Consolidation. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 6/28/2023. (JLS)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Middle; Case Number 3:22-cv-00949. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue (Doc. No. #12 ) is GRANTED, and the alternative motion to dismiss for forum non conveniens is DENIED AS MOOT. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), to the United States District Court for the District of South Dakota, Southern Division, in Sioux Falls, South Dakota. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/26/2023. (af) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/26/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(af) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S TEXT LETTER TO NON-ADMITTED ATTORNEY(S) Local Rule 83.2 (E) allows attorneys to appear pro hac vice (PHV) if they associate with local counsel. The rule provides, in relevant part, that '[a]n attorney who is not a member of the bar of this court, but who is a member in good standing of the bar of another United States District Court, may, upon motion and approval by the court, participate in the conduct of a particular case, but such motion may be allowed only if the applicant associates with a member in good standing of the bar of this court as local counsel.' Local counsel must sign and file all documents, and must be present in court during all proceedings unless otherwise ordered. The court's local rules are available on the district court's website located at www.sdd.uscourts.gov.To apply for admission PHV, complete the Motion for Admission PHV form found on our website under 'Local Forms' and submit it to local counsel for electronic filing. The PHV fee is $100. Local counsel may pay the fee electronically by using Pay.gov.Docket sheet mailed/emailed to non-resident attorney(s) (SLT)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Attorney Martha Boyd substituted as counsel for gpac, LLC in place of attorney Joy Boyd Longnecker. See Notice #19 .*** (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Martha L. Boyd on behalf of gpac, LLP. (Boyd, Martha) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Given the pendency of a Motion to Transfer Venue or Dismiss (Doc. No. #12 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for March 13, 2023 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, after disposition of this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/6/2023. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to Response to re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens or to Transfer filed by gpac, LLP. (Longnecker, Joy) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DECLARATION of Lauren E. Clements filed by Alexander Mayer re: #15 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Correspondence dated 8/17/2022, #2 Exhibit B - Correspondence dated 8/26/2022, #3 Exhibit C - Correspondence dated 11/17/2022, #4 Exhibit D - Correspondence dated 11/29/2022)(Clements, Lauren) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens or to Transfer filed by Alexander Mayer. (Clements, Lauren) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLARATION of Joy Boyd Longnecker filed by gpac, LLP re: #13 Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Declaration of J. Lawrence, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - SD State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - MAP Letter, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Sonsna Email, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Emails, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Emails, #7 Exhibit Ex. G MAP Email 10.25.22, #8 Exhibit Ex. H MAP Email 11.4.22, #9 Exhibit Ex. I MAP Email 11.12.22, #10 Exhibit Ex. J 11.17.22 Emails, #11 Exhibit Ex. K Sosna Email, #12 Exhibit Ex. L MAP Email 11.22.22, #13 Exhibit Ex. M Sosna Email 11.22.22, #14 Exhibit Ex. N Green Key Case)(Longnecker, Joy) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens or to Transfer filed by gpac, LLP . (Longnecker, Joy) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens or to Transfer by gpac, LLP. (Longnecker, Joy) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Motion #10 GRANTED. The initial case management conference is RESET for 3/13/2023 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/18/2023. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by gpac, LLP. (Longnecker, Joy) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 and #8 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Jeremy D. Sosna and Lauren E. Clements to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 12/09/2022. (lh) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Lauren E. Clements to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3718675) by Alexander Mayer. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Anderson, J.) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Jeremy D. Sosna to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-3718661) by Alexander Mayer. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Anderson, J.) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for Joy Boyd Longnecker, Katelyn R. Dwyer admitted to this court. (mg) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joy Boyd Longnecker on behalf of gpac, LLP (Longnecker, Joy) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/23/2023 at 3:30 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons issued as to gpac, LLP. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against gpac, LLP (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3712019) filed by Alexander Mayer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement, #2 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MN State Bar status verified as active for Jeremy D. Sosna, Lauren E. Clements not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE TO COUNSEL Jeremy D. Sosna, Lauren E. Clements: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 12/13/2022. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order TN State Bar status verified as active for J. Christopher Anderson admitted to this court. (ln) [Transferred from Tennessee Middle on 5/26/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayer v. gpac, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gpac LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?