Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC v. Jens et al
Plaintiff: Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC
Defendant: Brett Jens, J.R. Simplot Company, Shane Fastnacht, Phylicia Hoffman and Wes Hotchkiss
Case Number: 4:2023cv04104
Filed: July 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Referring Judge: Lawrence L Piersol
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Strike #82 Brief Exhibit A Attached to Wilbur-Ellis's Post-Hearing Brief by J.R. Simplot Company. (Sutton, Jason)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 BRIEF by Plaintiff Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC re #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #29 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Articles of Oganization) (Goldstein, David)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Filing Error: #80 Brief was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Goldstein, David)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 BRIEF by Defendant J.R. Simplot Company (Sutton, Jason)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 (FILED IN ERROR) BRIEF by Plaintiff Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC re #29 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Articles of Organization) (Goldstein, David) Modified on 11/13/2023 (SAC).
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 BRIEF by Defendant Brett Jens (Hale, William)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re #70 Motion Hearing held on 11-1-23 before Judge Piersol. Court Reporter: Carla Dedula, Telephone number: 16053306669. Transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The parties have twenty-one (21) calendar days to file a Redaction Request of this transcript. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2024. (Dedula, Carla)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re Motion Hearing held on 10-31-23 before Judge Piersol. Court Reporter: Carla Dedula, Telephone number: 16053306669. Transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The parties have twenty-one (21) calendar days to file a Redaction Request of this transcript. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2024. (Dedula, Carla)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RESTRICTED EXHIBITS offered by Shane Fastnacht, Phylicia Hoffman, Wes Hotchkiss during #70 Motion Hearing on October 31-November 1, 2023 before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. The offering party must review its attached exhibits to determine if redactions are required. If redactions are required, the offering party must electronically file its documentary exhibits offered and/or received into evidence during the trial or evidentiary hearing, including ALL redacted documents and ALL documents that do not require redaction, within 21 days using the Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits event. This requirement excludes exhibits that were sealed when offered and/or received. If no redactions are necessary, the attached exhibits will be unrestricted in 21 days on 11/24/2023. (DJP)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 RESTRICTED EXHIBITS offered by Brett Jens during #70 Motion Hearing on October 31-November 1, 2023 before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. The offering party must review its attached exhibits to determine if redactions are required. If redactions are required, the offering party must electronically file its documentary exhibits offered and/or received into evidence during the trial or evidentiary hearing, including ALL redacted documents and ALL documents that do not require redaction, within 21 days using the Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits event. This requirement excludes exhibits that were sealed when offered and/or received. If no redactions are necessary, the attached exhibits will be unrestricted in 21 days on 11/24/2023. (DJP)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 RESTRICTED EXHIBITS offered by J.R. Simplot Company during #70 Motion Hearing on October 31-November 1, 2023 before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. The offering party must review its attached exhibits to determine if redactions are required. If redactions are required, the offering party must electronically file its documentary exhibits offered and/or received into evidence during the trial or evidentiary hearing, including ALL redacted documents and ALL documents that do not require redaction, within 21 days using the Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits event. This requirement excludes exhibits that were sealed when offered and/or received. If no redactions are necessary, the attached exhibits will be unrestricted in 21 days on 11/24/2023. (DJP)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 RESTRICTED EXHIBITS offered by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC during #70 Motion Hearing on October 31-November 1, 2023 before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. The offering party must review its attached exhibits to determine if redactions are required. If redactions are required, the offering party must electronically file its documentary exhibits offered and/or received into evidence during the trial or evidentiary hearing, including ALL redacted documents and ALL documents that do not require redaction, within 21 days using the Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits event. This requirement excludes exhibits that were sealed when offered and/or received. If no redactions are necessary, the attached exhibits will be unrestricted in 21 days on 11/24/2023. (DJP)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Defendants' Combined Exhibit List re #70 Motion Hearing held on October 31, 2023 to November 1, 2023 before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. (DJP) (Main Document 72 replaced on 11/2/2023) (DJP).
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Plaintiff's Exhibit List re #70 Motion Hearing held on October 31 to November 1, 2023 before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. (DJP)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Motion Hearing completed on 11/1/2023 re #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol.. (Court Reporter: Carla Dedula) (DJP)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Motion Hearing BEGAN on 10/31/2023 re #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol.. (Court Reporter: Carla Dedula) (DJP)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SEALED Memorandum in Opposition re #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . (Attachments: #1 Sealed Deposition of Tracie Gogolin, #2 Sealed Zoom Deposition of Sarah Hanson, #3 Sealed 2nd Zoom Deposition of Sarah Hanson, #4 Sealed Deposition of Wes Hotchkiss, #5 Sealed Deposition of Brett Jens, #6 Sealed Zoom Deposition of Phillip Gilbert) (KLE)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 NOTICE of Filing Error: #63 Declaration was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Roesler, Beth) (KLE). Modified on 10/30/2023 to assign docket number (KLE).
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 BRIEF by Defendant J.R. Simplot Company re #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Email) (Sutton, Jason)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 BRIEF by Defendant Brett Jens Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Roesler, Beth)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 DECLARATION of William J. Hale . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Roesler, Beth)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 DECLARATION of Brett Jens . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (Roesler, Beth)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 [FILED IN ERROR] DECLARATION of Brett Jens . (Roesler, Beth) Modified on 10/30/2023 to add text (KLE).
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION to Amend/Correct #30 Proposed Order, #29 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. (Goldstein, David)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SEALED BRIEF in Opposition to Plaintiff's re #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief by Defendants Fastnacht, Hoffman and Hotchkiss. ;s (KLE)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order [Affidavit of Alex M. Hagen] [All Attachments filed under Seal] filed by Shane Fastnacht, Phylicia Hoffman, Wes Hotchkiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt from Transcript of Motion Hearing 5/9/23, Wilbur-Ellis v. Erikson, #2 Exhibit B - Wilbur-Ellis Answers to Interrogatories from Simplot, #3 Exhibit C - Wilbur-Ellis Job Board screen capture 10/26/23, #4 Attachment Placeholder - Fastnacht depo transcript, #5 Attachment - Hotchkiss depo transcript, #6 Attachment - Gogolin depo transcript, #7 Attachment - Hanson depo transcript, #8 Attachment - Gilbert depo transcript, #9 Attachment - Lenocker depo transcript, #10 Attachment - Considine depo transcript, #11 Attachment - Hanson/Wilbur-Ellis 30(b)(6) depo transcript, #12 Attachment Depo Ex 18 - slide show, #13 Attachment Depo Ex 46 - Resp and Obj to Def's Notice of Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) depo of Wilbur-Ellis, #14 Attachment Depo Ex 51 - 8/4/23 email chain, #15 Attachment Depo Ex 53 - Glassdoor information, #16 Attachment Depo Ex 56 - Hotchkiss exit interview) (Hagen, Alex) (Replaced all exhibits on 10/26/2023 per protective order) (KLE). Modified on 10/26/2023 to remove placeholder language (KLE).
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order [Redacted] filed by Shane Fastnacht, Phylicia Hoffman, Wes Hotchkiss. (Hagen, Alex)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Donald W. Myers for Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/25/2023. (CLR)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PROPOSED ORDER by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC re #56 MOTION for Attorney Donald W. Myers to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4144576) (Goldstein, David)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Attorney Donald W. Myers to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4144576) by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. (Goldstein, David)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CERTIFICATE of Service by Shane Fastnacht, Phylicia Hoffman, Wes Hotchkiss (Landon, Stephen)
September 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kelli C. Fuqua for Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/25/2023. (SLT)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Attorney Kelli C. Fuqua to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4123361) by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. (Goldstein, David)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by William Hale on behalf of Brett Jens. (Hale, William)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #49 Motion to Amend. Discovery due by 9/8/2023 Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2023 at 09:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 08/28/2023. (KLE)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 PROPOSED ORDER by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC re #49 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #47 Scheduling Order,, Terminate Motions, (Goldstein, David)
August 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #47 Scheduling Order,, Terminate Motions, by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. (Goldstein, David)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Shane Fastnacht, Phylicia Hoffman, Wes Hotchkiss. (Landon, Stephen)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER: (Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2023 at 10:00 AM, and lasting, as necessary, through 9/8/2023, in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol. Motions terminated: #35 Unopposed MOTION to Modify the Court's August 9, 2023 Order re #33 Scheduling Order. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 8/21/2023. (CLR)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Wes Hotchkiss on 8/2/23 (Goldstein, David)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michelle A. Christy for Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 08/16/2023. (KLE)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lauren E. Clements for Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 08/16/2023. (KLE)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jeremy D. Sosna for Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 08/16/2023. (KLE)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Janell K. Broekemier for Defendant Brett Jens. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 08/16/2023. (KLE)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Phylicia Hoffman on 8/3/23 (Goldstein, David)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of Service by Brett Jens (Roesler, Beth)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Service by Brett Jens (Roesler, Beth)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Defendant J.R. Simplot Company's ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by J.R. Simplot Company. (Sutton, Jason)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Brett Jens. (Roesler, Beth)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROPOSED ORDER by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC re #35 Unopposed MOTION Unopposed Motion to Modify the Court's August 9, 2023 Order re #33 Scheduling Order (Goldstein, David)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION Unopposed Motion to Modify the Court's August 9, 2023 Order re #33 Scheduling Order by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. (Goldstein, David)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Regarding Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER [32-1]. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 08/09/2023. (KLE)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2023 at 10:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 08/09/2023. (KLE)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION for Expedited Discovery by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Joint Stipulation for Protective Order) (Goldstein, David)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2023 at 09:00 AM in Sioux Falls Courtroom 1 before U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 08/07/2023. (KLE)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PROPOSED ORDER by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC re #29 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Goldstein, David)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support re #28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Gilbert Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Gogolin Declaration, #3 Exhibit Attachment A to Gogolin Declaration, #4 Exhibit C - Sosna Declaration, #5 Exhibit A to Sosna Declaration, #6 Exhibit B to Sosna Declaration, #7 Exhibit C to Sosna Declaration, #8 Exhibit D - Considine Declaration, #9 Exhibit Appendix to Considine Declaration) (Goldstein, David)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. (Goldstein, David)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Shane Fastnacht on 8/1/23 (Goldstein, David)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex M. Hagen on behalf of Shane Fastnacht, Phylicia Hoffman, Wes Hotchkiss. (Hagen, Alex)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C. Landon on behalf of Shane Fastnacht, Phylicia Hoffman, Wes Hotchkiss. (Landon, Stephen)
July 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Shane Fastnacht, Phylicia Hoffman, Wes Hotchkiss. 3 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. (SAC)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. (Goldstein, David)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jens Employment Agreement) (Goldstein, David)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Defendant J.R. Simplot Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by J.R. Simplot Company. (Sutton, Jason)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROPOSED ORDER by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC re #19 MOTION for Attorney Michelle A. Christy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4081021) (Goldstein, David)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney Michelle A. Christy to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4081021) by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. (Goldstein, David)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER by Brett Jens Order Granting PHV for JKB (Roesler, Beth)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Attorney Janell K. Broekemier to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4077984) by Brett Jens. (Roesler, Beth)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 I have reviewed Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure requiring nongovernmental corporate parties or nongovernmental corporations that seek to intervene to file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock and certify that it does not apply to J.R. SIMPLOT COMPANY. (Sutton, Jason)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC re #14 MOTION for Attorney Lauren E. Clements to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4077398) (Goldstein, David)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney Lauren E. Clements to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4077398) by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. (Goldstein, David)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC re #12 MOTION for Attorney Jeremy D. Sosna to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4077394) (Goldstein, David)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney Jeremy D. Sosna to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4077394) by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. (Goldstein, David)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Wilbur-Ellis Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Wilbur-Ellis Holdings II, Inc. for Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. (Goldstein, David)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. Brett Jens served on 7/8/2023, answer due 7/31/2023. (Goldstein, David)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Dean Lundberg on behalf of Brett Jens. (Lundberg, Paul)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth A. Roesler on behalf of Brett Jens. (Roesler, Beth)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. J.R. Simplot Company served on 7/7/2023, answer due 7/28/2023. (Goldstein, David)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Hieb on behalf of J.R. Simplot Company. (Hieb, David)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K. Hensley on behalf of J.R. Simplot Company. (Hensley, Laura)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Sutton on behalf of J.R. Simplot Company. (Sutton, Jason)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 7/7/2023. (CLR)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to J.R. Simplot Company, Brett Jens. 2 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel.. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLE)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4067018, in shell case on 07/06/2023 filed by Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Employment Agreement) (KLE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC v. Jens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbur-Ellis Company LLC
Represented By: David J. Goldstein
Represented By: Jeremy D. Sosna
Represented By: Lauren E. Clements
Represented By: Michelle A. Christy
Represented By: Donald W. Myers
Represented By: Kelli C. Fuqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Jens
Represented By: Beth A. Roesler
Represented By: Janell K. Broekemier
Represented By: Paul Dean Lundberg
Represented By: William Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.R. Simplot Company
Represented By: David J. Hieb
Represented By: Jason R. Sutton
Represented By: Laura K. Hensley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Fastnacht
Represented By: Stephen C. Landon
Represented By: Alex M. Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phylicia Hoffman
Represented By: Stephen C. Landon
Represented By: Alex M. Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wes Hotchkiss
Represented By: Stephen C. Landon
Represented By: Alex M. Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?