Ruiz Carreon v. Alpine ITW BCG Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Ruiz Carreon
Defendant: Alpine ITW BCG Inc., Energy Panel Structures, Inc., United Development, LLC and Josh Tevelde
Case Number: 4:2023cv04108
Filed: July 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Dakota
Presiding Judge: Roberto A Lange
Nature of Suit: Torts: Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 9/5/2023. (JLS)
August 31, 2023 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Energy Panel Structures, Inc.. (Eden, Shane)
August 31, 2023 Filing 22 (FILED IN ERROR) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Energy Panel Structures, Inc.. (Eden, Shane) Modified on 9/1/2023 (DJP).
August 31, 2023 NOTICE of Filing Error: #22 Answer to Complaint was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Eden, Shane)
August 28, 2023 Filing 21 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by United Development, LLC. (Arndt, Mark)
August 28, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE (Corporate Disclosure Statement not filed). D.S.D. Civ. L.R. 7.1.1 requires non-governmental organizational parties or intervenors to file either a Corporate Disclosure Statement or a Certificate that Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 is not applicable within 14 days of the party or intervenors first pleading or entry of appearance. The deadline has passed and United Development, LLC has not complied. Said party has three business days to comply. Compliance may be achieved by docketing the statement or certificate in CM/ECF using the Corporate Disclosure Statement or Certificate of Non-Applicability event. (RRB)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian P. Rickert for Energy Panel Structures, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 08/24/2023. (MSB)
August 23, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney Brian P. Rickert to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4104434) by Energy Panel Structures, Inc.. (Peterson, Mitchell)
August 10, 2023 Filing 17 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Energy Panel Structures, Inc.. (Eden, Shane)
August 10, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane E. Eden on behalf of Energy Panel Structures, Inc.. (Eden, Shane)
August 10, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Energy Panel Structures, Inc. . (Peterson, Mitchell)
August 10, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell A. Peterson on behalf of Energy Panel Structures, Inc.. (Peterson, Mitchell)
August 10, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley J. Lindeman on behalf of Josh Tevelde. (Lindeman, Bradley)
August 10, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan W.W. Redd on behalf of United Development, LLC. (Redd, Ryan)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Roland Christensen for Jonathan Ruiz Carreon. Signed by Chief Judge Roberto A. Lange on 08/10/2023. (MSB)
August 10, 2023 Filing 10 Defendant Joshua Telvelde's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Josh Tevelde. (Lindeman, Bradley)
August 9, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney Roland Christensen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number ASDDC-4093765) by Jonathan Ruiz Carreon. (Ramsey, Erica)
August 8, 2023 Filing 8 SEPARATE ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United Development, LLC. (Arndt, Mark)
August 4, 2023 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant United Development, LLC on 07/20/2023 (Ramsey, Erica)
August 4, 2023 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Josh Tevelde on 07/20/2023 (Ramsey, Erica)
August 4, 2023 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE Executed upon Defendant Energy Panel Structures, Inc. on 07/20/2023 (Ramsey, Erica)
July 17, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alpine ITW BCG Inc., Energy Panel Structures, Inc., Josh Tevelde, United Development, LLC. Four Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel.. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (DJP)
July 17, 2023 Filing 3 AMENDED #2 Request for Issuance of Summons by Jonathan Ruiz Carreon. (Ramsey, Erica) Modified docket text on 7/18/2023 (DJP).
July 14, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Jonathan Ruiz Carreon. (Ramsey, Erica)
July 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $402 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4073832, in shell case on 07/14/2023 filed by Jonathan Ruiz Carreon. (VMM)
July 14, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: #National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (VMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Dakota District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz Carreon v. Alpine ITW BCG Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Ruiz Carreon
Represented By: Brendan V. Johnson
Represented By: Erica A. Ramsey
Represented By: Roland Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpine ITW BCG Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Energy Panel Structures, Inc.
Represented By: Brian P. Rickert
Represented By: Mitchell A. Peterson
Represented By: Shane E. Eden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Development, LLC
Represented By: Mark J. Arndt
Represented By: Ryan W.W. Redd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Tevelde
Represented By: Bradley J. Lindeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?